Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 79876-COA
Short Caption:SAMSARA INVS. LLC SER. #4 VS. CARRINGTON MORTG. SERVS., LLCCourt:Court of Appeals
Related Case(s):79876
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A745087Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/28/2020Case Status UpdateTransferred from Supreme Court. (COA).
12/29/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance. Aimee Clark Newberry, Esq., of Clark Newberry Law Firm, files this Notice of Appearance for Appellant, Samsara Investments LLC Series 4. (COA)20-46835
12/29/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Disassociation. Tara Clark Newberry, Esq. is no longer associated with the Clark Newberry Law Firm and requests that Tara Clark Newberry be removed from the service list. (COA)20-46846
02/08/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance (Scott R. Lachman of Akerman LLP, as counsel for respondent). (COA)21-03675
02/08/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Disassociation (Rex D. Garner is no longer with the law firm of Akerman LLP). (COA)21-03676
06/17/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." Court of Appeals-MG/JT/BB (COA)21-17536
07/12/2021Case Status UpdateTransferred to Supreme Court. (COA)
07/12/2021Case Status UpdateCase Closed. (COA)