Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Combined Case Information: 80285-COA & 80285
Short Caption:IN RE: GORMLEY IRISH IRREVOCABLE TRUST C/W 80286Court:Court of Appeals & Supreme Court
Consolidated:80285-COA*, 80286-COARelated Case(s):80155, 80285, 80286, 80286-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - P099082Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/31/2019Filing FeeFiling Fee due for Appeal. (SC)
12/31/2019Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)19-52449
12/31/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC)19-52452
01/23/2020TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Sherry Justice stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 10/16/19. (SC)20-03229
01/27/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Proper Person Appellant's Notice Regarding Informa Pauperis. (SC)20-03665
02/20/2020OtherJustice Abbi Silver disqualified from participation in this matter. (SC)
03/10/2020Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order. Certified copy of order filed in district court on 01/27/20. Order Denying Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. (SC)20-09396
03/13/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellant shall, within 10 days from the date of this order, pay the filing fee or file a motion that complies with NRAP 24(a)(5)(A). (SC)20-10011
03/18/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Proper Person Appellant's Affidavit in Support of Motion to Proceed on Appeal in Forma Pauperis. (SC)20-10671
03/26/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Waiving Filing Fee. (SC).20-11638
03/27/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Regarding Deadlines. (SC)20-11806
04/23/2020Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal - Volumes 1-9. via FTP (SC)20-16663
04/27/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Dismissing Appeal and Consolidating Appeals. "The appeal in Docket No. 80155 is dismissed." Because the remaining appeals arise from the same underlying litigation and involve the same parties, this court elects to consolidate the appeals for all appellate purposes. Because the record has been ordered in Docket No. 80286, no record will be ordered for Docket No. 80285. Appellant shall have until July 27, 2020, to file a single opening brief. Nos. 80155/80285/80286. (SC)20-15956
04/29/2020Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal - SEALED Pages 1631-1651, 1805-1810, 1953-1958, and 1973. (SC)
05/08/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. Appellant has filed a pro se motion for a stay pending appeal in Docket No. 80286. The motion is denied without prejudice. Nos. 80285/80286. (SC).20-17483
05/21/2020MotionFiled Proper Person Motion for Reconsideration Nos. 80285/80286. (SC)20-19440
05/28/2020MotionFiled Respondent's Response to Motion for Reconsideration. Nos. 80285/80286. (SC).20-20148
06/05/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. Appellant has filed a motion for reconsideration of this court's order denying, without prejudice, her motion for a stay of the district court's order designating her a vexatious litigant. The motion is denied. Nos. 80285/80286. (SC).20-21145
08/05/2020MotionFiled Proper Person Appellant's Motion for Additional Time to File Opening Brief. Nos. 80285/80286. (SC)20-28601
08/11/2020MotionFiled Respondent's Response to Motion for Additional Time to File Opening Brief. Nos. 80285/80286. (SC).20-29598
08/12/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Certificate of Service (Respondent's Response to Motion for Additional Time to File Opening Brief). Nos. 80285/80286. (SC)20-29797
08/13/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant's opening brief or informal brief due: September 25, 2020. Nos. 80285/80286 (SC)20-29932
10/01/2020BriefFiled Proper Person Appellant's Opening Brief. Nos. 80285/80286. (SC)20-36054
10/01/2020OtherReturned Unfiled Document. Exhibits 1 through 16. (SC)20-36084
11/23/2020Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/Submitted For Decision. Nos. 80285/80286. (SC)
12/28/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Transfer Case to Court of Appeals. Nos. 80285/80286. (SC).20-46651
12/28/2020Case Status UpdateTransferred to Court of Appeals. Nos. 80285/80286. (SC).
12/28/2020Case Status UpdateTransferred from Supreme Court. Nos. 80285/80286. (COA).
04/29/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "We affirm the dismissal of Lori's petition and the decision to declare Lori a vexatious litigant at issue in Docket No. 80286. We further affirm the award of attorney fees and costs at issue in Docket No. 80285." Court of Appeals-MG/JT/BB Nos. 80285/80286. (COA)21-12304
04/29/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "We affirm the dismissal of Lori's petition and the decision to declare Lori a vexatious litigant at issue in Docket No. 80286. We further affirm the award of attorney fees and costs at issue in Docket No. 80285." Court of Appeals-MG/JT/BB Nos. 80285/80286. (SC)
05/19/2021Case Status UpdateTransferred to Supreme Court. Nos. 80285/80286 (COA)
05/19/2021Case Status UpdateTransferred from Court of Appeals. Nos. 80285/80286 (SC)
05/19/2021Case Status UpdateCase Closed. Nos. 80285/80286 (COA)
05/19/2021Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Proper Person Petition for Review. Nos. 80285/80286. (SC)21-14462
06/04/2021Post-Judgment Order/DispositionalFiled Order Denying Petition for Review. "Review denied." fn1[The Honorable Abbi Silver, Justice, did not participate in the decision of this matter.] EN BANC Nos. 80285/80286. (SC)21-16058
06/04/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)21-16060
06/04/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
06/18/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on June 7, 2021. Nos. 80285/80286. (SC)21-16060