Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 80546-COA
Short Caption:LAS VEGAS RENTAL HOMES CORP. VS. THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLONCourt:Court of Appeals
Related Case(s):80546
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A791976Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/28/2020Case Status UpdateTransferred from Supreme Court. (COA).
07/21/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." Court of Appeals- MG/JT/BB. (COA)21-20942
08/03/2021Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant's petition for rehearing due: August 23, 2021. (COA)21-22513
08/30/2021Case Status UpdateTransferred to Supreme Court. (COA)
08/30/2021Case Status UpdateCase Closed. (COA)