Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 81131-COA
Short Caption:SAAFIR (KWAME) VS. CITY OF LAS VEGASCourt:Court of Appeals
Related Case(s):80593, 81131
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C342511Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/28/2020Case Status UpdateTransferred from Supreme Court. (COA).
04/12/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order Affirming in Part, Reversing in Part and Remanding. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED IN PART AND REVERSED IN PART AND REMAND this matter to the district court for proceedings consistent with this order." Court of Appeals- MG/JT/BB. (COA)21-10496
04/20/2021Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Respondent's Petition for Rehearing. (REJECTED PER NOTICE FILED ON 4/21/21). (COA)
04/21/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Of Rejection - No Notice Of Appearance. (COA)21-11481
04/21/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance of Counsel for Respondent. (COA)21-11515
04/21/2021Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Respondent's Motion and Petition for Rehearing. (COA)21-11516
04/21/2021AppendixFiled Respondent's Appendix to Petition for Rehearing. (COA)21-11517
04/22/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The clerk shall add attorney Carlene M. Helbert as counsel for respondent. Respondent has filed a motion for leave to file a petition for rehearing. Because the petition for rehearing was timely filed, the motion is unnecessary. This court takes no action in regard to the motion. The petition for rehearing was filed on April 21, 2021. (COA)21-11599
06/15/2021Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). Court of Appeals- MG/JT/BB. (COA)21-17286
07/12/2021Case Status UpdateTransferred to Supreme Court. (COA)
07/12/2021Case Status UpdateCase Closed. (COA)