Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 80411-COA
Short Caption:GOLDEN CREEK HOLDINGS, INC. VS. BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.Court:Court of Appeals
Related Case(s):77979, 78100, 78100-COA, 78453, 78453-COA, 78558, 78558-COA, 78961, 79570, 79596, 79596-COA, 80411
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A697287Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/31/2020Case Status UpdateTransferred from Supreme Court. (COA).
04/12/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." Court of Appeals-MG/JT/BB (COA)21-10487
04/29/2021Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant's petition for rehearing due: May 14, 2021. (COA)21-12344
05/14/2021Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Appellant's Petition For Rehearing. (COA)21-14071
05/14/2021Filing FeeFiling fee paid on rehearing. E-Payment $150.00 from Joseph Y. Hong. (COA)
07/21/2021Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). (COA)21-20997
08/02/2021Case Status UpdateTransferred to Supreme Court. (COA)
08/02/2021Case Status UpdateCase Closed. (COA)