Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 82271
Short Caption:DAVIS (ARLEO) VS. DIST. CT. (STATE)Court:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):83383
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C346920Classification:Original Proceeding - Criminal - Mandamus
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/04/2021Filing FeePetition Filing Fee Waived. Criminal. (SC)
01/04/2021Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Mandamus. (SC)21-00070
01/04/2021AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ. (SC)21-00071
03/10/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Transmission of Supplemental Appendix and Answer. petitioner shall have 14 days from the date of this order to submit a supplemental appendix. The real party in interest, on behalf of respondents, shall have 21 days from the date the supplemental appendix is filed in this court to file an answer. (SC)21-06912
03/16/2021AppendixFiled Petitioner's Supplemental Appendix. (SC)21-07543
04/02/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance (John T. Niman, Deputy District Attorney as counsel for Real Party in Interest). (SC)21-09513
04/02/2021MotionFiled Real Party in Interest's Motion to Dismiss Appeal. (SC)21-09515
04/02/2021AppendixFiled Respondent's (Real Party in Interest) Appendix - Volume 1. (SC)21-09517
04/06/2021MotionFiled Real Party in Interest's Motion for Enlargement of Time (Answer). (SC)21-09868
04/09/2021MotionFiled Petitioner's Opposition to the State's Motion to Dismiss Appeal. (SC)21-10258
04/16/2021MotionFiled Real Party in Interest's Reply to Petitioner's Opposition to State's Motion to Dismiss Appeal. (SC)21-10980
04/16/2021MotionFiled Real Party in Interest's Motion to Transmit Exhibits Under NRAP 30(d). (SC)21-10981
05/07/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order Granting Motion to Dismiss. Real party in interest has filed a motion to dismiss the petition. Petitioner has opposed the motion, and real party in interest has filed a reply. Accordingly, without reaching the merits of the petition, "we grant real party in interest's motion to dismiss the petition as moot." fn1 [In light of this order, we deny real party in interest's motion for enlargement of time and motion to transmit exhibits under NRAP 30(d).] SNP21 - RP/LS/AS (SC)21-13118
06/04/2021RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. (SC)21-15982
06/04/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)