Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 82282
Short Caption:KUBIAK (AKSHAYA) VS. DIST. CT. (STATE)Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C350618Classification:Original Proceeding - Criminal - Mandamus
Disqualifications:Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:05/27/2021How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/07/2021Filing FeePetition Filing Fee Waived. Criminal. (SC)
01/07/2021Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Mandamus. (SC)21-00376
01/07/2021AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ. (SC)
01/07/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Rejection of Deficient Appendix. Corrected appendix due: 5 days. (SC)21-00394
01/07/2021AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 1. (SC)21-00395
01/07/2021AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 2. (SC)21-00396
01/07/2021AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 3. (SC)21-00397
01/07/2021AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 4. (SC)21-00398
01/07/2021AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 5. (SC)21-00400
01/07/2021AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 6. (SC)21-00401
01/15/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Supplementation of Appendix with Written Order and Directing Answer. Petitioner should obtain from the district court a written order memorializing its ruling and file and serve a supplemental appendix containing a copy of the district court's written order within 14 days from the date of this order. In the event petitioner timely files a supplemental appendix in accordance with this order, real party in interest, on behalf of respondents, shall have 28 days from the date petitioner serves his supplemental appendix to file and serve an answer, including authorities, against issuance of the requested writ. Petitioner shall have 14 days from service of the answer to file and serve any reply. (SC)21-01443
01/25/2021AppendixFiled Petitioner's Supplemental Appendix. (SC)21-02154
02/12/2021Petition/WritFiled Real Party in Interest's Answer to Petition for Writ. (SC)21-04239
02/12/2021AppendixFiled Real Party in Interest's Appendix to Answer to Petition for Writ. (SC)21-04241
02/26/2021Petition/WritFiled Petitioner's Reply to Answer to Petition for Writ of Mandamus. (SC)21-05852
05/27/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Submitting for Decision Without Oral Argument. (SC)21-15252
07/01/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order Denying Petition. "ORDER the petition DENIED." NNP21-EC/KP/DH (SC)21-18897
07/26/2021RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. (SC)21-21540
07/26/2021Case Status UpdateNotice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)