Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 82286
Short Caption:OLSON VS. GAGE VILL. COMMERICAL DEV., LLCCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV1801137Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:01/11/2021 / Andrews, JonathanSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/07/2021Filing FeeFiling Fee due for Appeal. (SC)
01/07/2021Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)21-00443
01/07/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC)21-00446
01/07/2021Filing FeeE-Payment $250.00 from Austin K. Sweet. (SC)
01/08/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellants - due: 21 days. (SC)21-00518
01/11/2021Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Jonathan L. Andrews. (SC)21-00815
01/27/2021Docketing StatementFiled Appellant's Civil Docketing Statement. (SC)21-02576
01/27/2021Transcript RequestFiled Appellant's Certificate of No Transcript Request. (SC)21-02578
01/27/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Appellants' Notice NRAP 26.1 Disclosure. (SC)21-02580
02/05/2021Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for March 30, 2021, at 9:00 AM. (SC)21-03532
03/31/2021Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. (SC)21-09290
03/31/2021Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellants' Opening Brief and Appendix due: 45 days. (SC)21-09321
04/13/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order to Show Cause. Appellant's Response due: 30 days. Respondents may file any reply within 14 days of service of appellants' response. Briefing of this appeal is suspended pending further order of this court. (SC)21-10625
05/13/2021MotionFiled Appellants' Response to Order to Show Cause. (SC)21-13819
05/17/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance. Daniel Polsenberg for respondents. (SC)21-14101
05/28/2021Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Respondents' reply to the response to order to show cause due: June 10, 2021. (SC)21-15342
06/10/2021MotionFiled Respondents' Reply to Response to Order to Show Cause. (SC)21-16779
06/21/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." NNP21 - EC/KP/DH (SC)21-17795
07/16/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)21-20529
07/16/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
07/23/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on July 20, 2021. (SC)21-20529