Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 82293
Short Caption:BONHAM (BRYAN) VS. WARDENCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):82293-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A822112Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:03/18/2021How Submitted:On Record And Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/08/2021Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee Waived. Criminal. (SC)
01/08/2021Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)21-00527
01/12/2021Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. (Second NOA) (SC)21-00935
01/15/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Transmission of Record and Regarding Briefing. Record on Appeal due: 30 days. Appellant's Opening Brief or Informal Brief due: 120 days. (SC)21-01405
01/26/2021BriefFiled Proper Person Appellant's Informal Brief. (SC)21-02453
01/27/2021Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal - A822112. (SC)21-02575
02/02/2021Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal pages 1 to 19 (Sealed). (SC)
03/18/2021Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/Submitted For Decision/To Screening. (SC)
04/05/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Transfer Case to Court of Appeals. (SC).21-09770
04/05/2021Case Status UpdateTransferred to Court of Appeals. (SC).
05/25/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." Court of Appeals- MG/JT/BB. (SC)
06/11/2021Case Status UpdateTransferred from Court of Appeals. (SC)
06/11/2021Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Proper Person Appellant's Petition for Review. (SC)21-16846
06/22/2021Post-Judgment Order/DispositionalFiled Order Denying Petition for Review. "Review denied." EN BANC (SC)21-17866
06/22/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)21-17868
06/22/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
07/02/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on June 23, 2021. (SC)21-17868