Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Combined Case Information: 79192-COA & 79192
Short Caption:ENERGY ENHANCEMENT SYS., LLC VS. STATE, DEP'T OF BUS. AND INDUS.Court:Court of Appeals & Supreme Court
Related Case(s):79192
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A778752Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/18/2019Filing FeeFiling Fee due for Appeal. (SC)
07/18/2019Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)19-30434
07/18/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC)19-30438
07/18/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement/Civil. Due date: 10 days. (SC)19-30440
07/22/2019Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Copy of District Court Minutes (Addendum to Notice of Appeal Packet). (SC)19-30688
07/29/2019Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Compan Law Office. Check no. 1344. (SC)
07/29/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 21 days. (SC).19-31894
08/01/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Appellants to File Case Appeal Statement. Case Appeal Statement due: 10 days. (SC).19-32438
08/05/2019Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Kathleen M. Paustian.19-32862
08/15/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Appellants to File Case Appeal Statement. Case Appeal Statement due: 10 days. (SC).19-34349
09/05/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Appellants to File Docketing Statement. Appellants' Docketing Statement due: 10 days. (SC).19-37224
09/05/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Conditionally Imposing Sanctions. Conditional sanction of $500 due: 15 days or Case Appeal Statement due: 10 days. (SC).19-37226
09/06/2019Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Not Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is not appropriate for mediation. (SC)19-37386
09/09/2019Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order Removing From Settlement Program/Briefing Reinstated. This appeal is removed from the settlement program. Appellants: 14 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief and appendix. (SC).19-37500
09/18/2019Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Appellants' Case Appeal Statement. (SC)19-38912
01/22/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Transcript, Opening Brief and for an Extended Briefing Schedule. (SC)20-03113
01/29/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Non-Opposition to Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Transcript, Opening Brief, and for an Extended Briefing Schedule. (SC)20-04090
01/30/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Transcript Request Form and Docketing Statement due: 7 days; Opening Brief and Appendix due: 45 days. (SC).20-04141
03/20/2020MotionFiled Respondent's Motion to Dismiss Appeal. (SC).20-11029
04/03/2020MotionFiled Appellants' Opposition to Motion to Dismiss. (SC)20-12844
04/10/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Regarding Motion. Respondent has filed a motion to dismiss this appeal based on appellants' repeated failure to timely file the docketing statement, transcript request form, and opening brief. This court declines to dismiss the appeal. Appellant's Docketing Statement and Transcript Request Form due: 7 days; Opening Brief and Appendix due: 30 days. (SC).20-13665
04/17/2020Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 5/29/19 To Court Reporter: Department XXIX. Appellant's Request for Transcript of the Proceedings. (REJECTED PER 4/20/20 NOTICE). (SC)
04/20/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Deficient Transcript Request. (SC)20-14937
04/24/2020TranscriptFiled Transcript of Proceedings - 5/29/19. (SC)20-15776
04/25/2020Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 5/29/19. To Court Reporter: Melissa Murphy-Delgado. (SC)20-15782
04/29/2020TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Melissa Delgado-Murphy stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 05/29/19. (SC)20-16195
05/11/2020BriefFiled Appellants' Opening Brief. (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED 5/11/20). (SC)
05/11/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Rejection of Deficient Opening Brief. Corrected brief due: 5 days. (SC)20-17865
05/14/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Part 1 (REJECTED PER 5/15/20 NOTICE). (SC)
05/14/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Part 2 (REJECTED PER 5/15/20 NOTICE). (SC)
05/14/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Vol. 3 (REJECTED PER 5/15/20 NOTICE). (SC)
05/15/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Deficient Appendix. Corrected appendix due: 5 days. (SC)20-18542
05/18/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC)20-18965
05/21/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief Part I. (SC)20-19421
05/21/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief Part II. (SC)20-19452
06/09/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Change of Address. (SC)20-21589
06/17/2020BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC)20-22673
06/17/2020AppendixFiled Respondent's Appendix to Answering Brief (REJECTED PER 6/18/20 NOTICE). (SC)20-22674
06/18/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Deficient Appendix. Corrected appendix due: 5 days. (SC)20-22710
06/18/2020AppendixFiled Respondent's Appendix to Answering Brief. (SC)20-22763
07/20/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief (REJECTED PER 7/21/20 NOTICE). (SC)
07/21/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Rejection of Filed Document (Appellant's Reply Brief). (SC)20-26562
07/27/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Late File Reply Brief. (SC)20-27353
07/29/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Reply Brief due: 7 days. (SC)20-27611
08/04/2020BriefFiled Appellants' Reply Brief. (SC)20-28504
08/05/2020Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. (SC)
08/07/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Conditionally Imposing Sanctions. Conditional sanction of $250 or Docketing Statement due: 14 days. (SC)20-29162
09/17/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Imposing Sanctions and Referring Counsel to State Bar. On August 7, 2020, this court entered an order conditionally imposing sanctions against attorney Stephen Compan. The sanction is no longer conditional and must be paid. Mr. Compan shall have 7 days from the date of this order to pay $250 to the Supreme Court Library and provide the clerk of this court with proof of such payment. This court hereby refers Mr. Compan to the State Bar of Nevada for investigation pursuant to SCR 104-105. Bar counsel shall, within 90 days of the date of this order, inform this court of the status or results of the investigation and any disciplinary proceedings in this matter. (SC)20-34293
09/24/2020Letter/IncomingFiled Appellant's Letter as Proof of Sanctions Payment. (SC)20-35229
10/06/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Payment of Sanction (Letter and Copy of Check Attached.). (SC).20-36618
12/17/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Investigative Report. Investigative Report from the State Bar of Nevada re: attorney Stephen Compan. Original report was placed in attorney's bar file. (SC).
01/11/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Transfer Case to Court of Appeals. (SC).21-00728
01/11/2021Case Status UpdateTransferred from Supreme Court. (COA).
01/11/2021Case Status UpdateTransferred to Court of Appeals. (SC).
03/12/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Investigative Report. Investigative Report from the State Bar of Nevada re: attorney Stephen Compan. Original report was placed in attorney's bar file. (SC).
04/28/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order Affirming in Part, Reversing in Part and Remanding. "We AFFIRM in part, REVERSE in part, and REMAND this matter to the district court with instructions to VACATE the portion of the ALJ's order concluding that EES violated NRS 598.0915(15) and any fine or penalty related thereto." Court of Appeals- MG/JT/BB. (COA)21-12180
04/28/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order Affirming in Part, Reversing in Part and Remanding. "We AFFIRM in part, REVERSE in part, and REMAND this matter to the district court with instructions to VACATE the portion of the ALJ's order concluding that EES violated NRS 598.0915(15) and any fine or penalty related thereto." Court of Appeals- MG/JT/BB. (SC)
05/26/2021Case Status UpdateTransferred to Supreme Court. (COA).
05/26/2021Case Status UpdateTransferred from Court of Appeals. (SC).
05/26/2021Case Status UpdateCase Closed. (COA).
05/26/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC).21-15052
05/26/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC).
06/18/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on May 27, 2021. (SC)21-15052