Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 78957-COA
Short Caption:FOSTER VS. KING, M.D. C/W 79653Court:Court of Appeals
Consolidated:78957-COA*, 79653-COARelated Case(s):78957, 79653, 79653-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A717133Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:04/27/2021 at 11:00 AMOral Argument Location:Las Vegas
Submission Date:04/27/2021How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/11/2021Case Status UpdateTransferred from Supreme Court. Nos. 78957/79653. (COA).
03/04/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Scheduling Oral Argument. This matter is scheduled for oral argument on April 27, 2021, at 11:00 a.m. Argument shall be limited to 30 minutes. Oral argument will be held by videoconference. The court will use the BlueJeans videoconferencing system, which requires laptop/desktop/videoconferencing computer internet access and audio and video (web camera) capability. In case technical difficulties develop at any time, the court will conduct the oral argument by teleconference, which will require counsel to have immediate access to a landline phone connection. On or before March 31, 2021, the parties shall submit to the Clerk of the Court a notice identifying the attorney(s) who will argue the case and the landline and cellular phone numbers and email address of that attorney(s). The notice may be emailed to the court at nvscclerk@nvcourts.nv.gov. The attorneys will be required to schedule a session with the Clerk of the Court to test the capabilities of the connection and video equipment approximately one week prior to argument. Nos. 78957/79653 (COA)21-06318
03/30/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Notice Regarding Oral Argument (Mohamed A. Iqbal, Jr. will argue the appeal on behalf of Appellant). Nos. 78957/79653. (COA)21-09271
04/27/2021Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the Court of Appeals. 78957-COA. (COA21-MG/BB/JT) (COA).
05/26/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order Reversing (Docket No. 78957-COA). Vacating (Docket No. 79653-COA) and Remanding. "ORDER the judgement of the district court REVERSED (Docket No. 78957-COA), VACATED (Docket No. 79653-COA). AND REMAND this matter to the district court for proceedings consistent with this order." Nos. 78957/79653. Court of Appeals- MG/JT/BB. (COA)21-15061
06/21/2021Case Status UpdateTransferred to Supreme Court. (COA)
06/21/2021Case Status UpdateCase Closed. (COA)