Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 82303
Short Caption:RHODES (NATHANIAL) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR191220Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/11/2021Filing FeeFiling Fee Waived - Criminal. (SC)
01/11/2021Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement and notice of briefing schedule mailed to counsel for appellant.) (SC)21-00825
01/25/2021Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Criminal Appeals. (SC)21-02234
02/01/2021Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 02/19/20, 11/3/20 and 12/7/20. To Court Reporter: Sunshine Litigation, Court Reporters for Dept. 6. (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED 02/01/21). (SC)
02/01/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Rejection of Filed Document. Request for Transcript of Proceedings. (SC)21-03057
02/09/2021TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Kate Murray stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 02/19/20. (SC)21-03916
02/10/2021TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Linda Shaw stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 12/7/20. (SC)21-04032
02/12/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing the Filing of Transcript Request Form. Due: 7 days. (SC)21-04330
02/12/2021Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 2/19/20, 11/23/20, and 12/7/20. To Court Reporter: Sunshine Litigation. (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED ON 2/21/21). (SC)21-04357
02/16/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Deficient Transcript Request. (SC)21-04443
02/17/2021Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 02/19/20 and 12/07/20 To Court Reporter: Sunshine Litigation, Court Reporters for Dept. 6. (SC)21-04622
03/09/2021TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Lesley A. Clarkson stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 11/23/20.21-06864
04/23/2021MotionFiled Stipulation to Dismiss Appeal. (SC)21-11851
04/27/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Disapproving Stipulation. The parties have filed a stipulation for a voluntary dismissal of this appeal. Because the instant stipulation is not accompanied by an affidavit, the stipulation is disapproved without prejudice to the parties' right to refile with the required affidavit attached. (SC)21-12055
04/29/2021MotionFiled Stipulation to Dismiss Appeal. (SC)21-12268
05/07/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order/Voluntary Dismissal. "ORDERS this appeal DISMISSED." Case Closed/No Remittitur Issued. SNP21-RP/LS/AS (SC)21-13111