Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 82326
Short Caption:HARRIS VS. HARRISCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D573866Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:01/13/2021 / Shirinian, AraSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/13/2021Filing FeeFiling Fee due for Appeal. Filing fee has been dropped in the LV Drop Box and is being forwarded. (SC)
01/13/2021Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) (SEALED) (SC)
01/13/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. (SC)21-01037
01/13/2021Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Kelleher & Kelleher. Check no. 17791. (SC)
01/13/2021Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Ara H. Shirinian. (SC)21-01139
02/03/2021Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for February 23, 2021, at 10:00 AM. (SC)21-03324
02/04/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Docketing Statement. Due date: 10 days. (SC)21-03410
02/12/2021Docketing StatementFiled Appellant's Civil Docketing Statement. (SC)21-04295
02/12/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Provide Proof of Service. Due date: 10 days. (SC)21-04342
02/23/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Certificate of Service (Docketing Statement Civil Appeals). (SC)21-05290
03/17/2021Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. (SC)21-07749
03/18/2021Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant(s): 14 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief and appendix. (SC)21-07870
04/02/2021Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant's transcript request form due: April 15, 2021. (SC)21-09506
04/08/2021Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 8/11/20. To Court Reporter: Verbatim Report and Transcription, LLC. (SC)21-10175
04/12/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order to Show Cause. Appellant's Response due: 30 days. Respondent may file any reply within 14 days of service of appellant's response. The deadlines to file documents in this appeal are suspended pending further order of this court. (SC)21-10372
05/12/2021Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant's response to order to show cause due: May 26, 2021. (SC)21-13669
05/17/2021TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter Sherry Justice/Transcript Video Services stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 08/11/2020. (SC)21-14192
05/25/2021MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Dismiss Appeal/Notice of Withdrawal of Appeal. (SC)21-14931
06/10/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "The motion is granted and this appeal is dismissed." Case Closed/No Remittitur Issued. (SC).21-16718