Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 82329
Short Caption:RIFFEL VS. ANDERSONCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):82774, 82774-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV2001469Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/13/2021Filing FeeFiling Fee due for Appeal. (SC)
01/13/2021Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)21-01068
01/13/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC)21-01070
01/22/2021Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Wallace & Millsap LLC. Check No. 1953. (SC)
01/22/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Exemption from Settlement Program/File Documents. Transcript request due: 14 days. Opening brief due: 120 days. Docketing statement mailed to appellant's counsel, due: 21 days. (SC)21-02044
02/05/2021Transcript RequestFiled Appellant's Certificate of No Transcript Request. (SC)21-03534
03/08/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order to File Docketing Statement. Appellant shall have 7 days from the date of this order to file and serve the docketing statement. (SC)21-06709
03/09/2021Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (SC)21-06792
03/17/2021Docketing StatementFiled Respondents' Response to Docketing Statement. (SC)21-07722
03/18/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order to Show Cause. Appellant's Response due: 30 days. Respondents may file any response within 14 days of service of appellant's response. The deadlines to file documents in this appeal are suspended pending further order of this court. (SC)21-07814
04/14/2021Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Mandamus (REJECTED PER TELEPHONE CONVERSATION WITH ATTORNEY PATRICK MILLSAP'S OFFICE)
04/14/2021Filing FeeFiling fee paid. E-Payment $250.00 from Patrick R. Millsap. (REFUNDED)
04/15/2021MotionFiled Appellant Brian Riffel's Response to Order to Show Cause. (SC)21-10889
04/20/2021MotionFiled Respondents' Reply to Response to Show Cause. (SC)21-11432
04/23/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." SNP21 - RP/LS/AS (SC)21-11742
05/19/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC).21-14410
05/19/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC).
06/07/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on May 24, 2021. (SC)21-14410