Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 82330
Short Caption:STATE VS. PARIS (MARCUS)Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C350327Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Pretrial
Disqualifications:Case Status:Submitted for Decision
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:02/05/2021How Submitted:On Record
Expedited

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/13/2021Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee Waived. Criminal. (SC)
01/13/2021Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Filed certified copy of notice of appeal. (SC)21-01075
01/26/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Appellant's Notice of Appearance for Karen Mishler. (SC)21-02432
01/26/2021Transcript RequestFiled Appellant's Certificate of No Transcript Request. (SC)21-02433
01/26/2021Docketing StatementFiled Appellant's Criminal Docketing Statement. (SC)21-02435
01/29/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Transmission of Record. Record on Appeal due: 30 days. Upon the filing of the record in this court, this appeal shall stand submitted for decision without further briefing or oral argument unless the court otherwise orders.(SC)21-02848
02/02/2021Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal. C-20-350327-1. Via FTP. Vols. 1-5. (SC)21-03184
02/05/2021Case Status UpdateSubmitted for Decision. (SC)