Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 82333
Short Caption:CAGE VS. COPPEDGECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):83148
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - R136990Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/13/2021Filing FeeFiling Fee due for Appeal. (SC)
01/13/2021Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)21-01142
01/13/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC)21-01145
02/05/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The documents presently before this court indicate that a motion to proceed in forma pauperis was filed in the district court on March 30, 2020. The district court shall, within 30 days of the date of this order, enter a written order resolving the motion in compliance with NRAP 24. In the event the district court enters a written order (or has already entered a written order of which this court is unaware), the clerk of the district court shall immediately transmit a certified copy of the order to the clerk of this court. (SC)21-03521
02/25/2021Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order. Certified copy of order filed in district court on 02/18/21. (Order to Proceed in Forma Pauperis is Granted). (SC)21-05627
02/26/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Waiving Filing Fee. (SC)21-05738
03/01/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Regarding Deadlines. (SC)21-05889
03/02/2021Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order. Certified copy of order filed in district court on 02/22/21. Order to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (Defendant Kori Lovett Cage's request is granted). (SC)21-06086
04/08/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDERS this appeal DISMISSED." SNP21-RP/LS/AS (SC)21-10137
05/03/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)21-12553
05/03/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
05/18/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on May 4, 2021. (SC)21-12553