Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 82346
Short Caption:IN RE: DISCIPLINE OF BRIAN J. RAMSEYCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):NONEClassification:Bar Matter - Discipline - Appeal
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:02/18/2021How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/15/2021Filing FeeAppeal Filing fee waived, Bar Matter/Bar Discipline. (SC).
01/15/2021Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record of Bar Proceedings. Vols. I - II. (SC).21-01339
01/15/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Briefing Schedule/Bar Discipline. Due date: 30 days. If no opening brief is filed, the matter will be submitted for decision on the record without briefing or oral argument. (SC).21-01343
02/18/2021Case Status UpdateSubmitted for Decision. (SC).
02/22/2021MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Opening Brief. (SC)21-05130
02/22/2021MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Vacate or Rescind Submittal Order. (SC)21-05240
02/22/2021MotionFiled Appellant's Second Motion for Extension of Time. (SC)21-05241
02/22/2021AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume I. (SC)21-05242
02/22/2021AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume II. (SC)21-05243
02/22/2021AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume I [corrected version]. (SC)21-05244
02/22/2021AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume III. (SC)21-05245
02/22/2021AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume IV. (SC)21-05246
02/22/2021AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume V. (SC)21-05247
02/22/2021AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume VI. (SC)21-05248
02/22/2021AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume VII. (SC)21-05249
02/22/2021AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume VIII. (SC)21-05250
02/22/2021AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume IX. (SC)21-05251
02/22/2021AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume X. (SC)21-05252
02/22/2021AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume XI. (SC)21-05253
02/23/2021BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC)21-05300
03/02/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motions for Extensions of Time. The opening brief and appendix were filed on February 22 and 23, 2021. The State Bar of Nevada shall have until March 25, 2021, to file and serve its answering brief. fn1[Mr. Ramsey has also filed a motion to vacate the submittal order. On February 18, 2021, the clerk of this court updated the status of this appeal to "Submitted for Decision" but no submittal order has been entered. Accordingly, the motion is denied as moot. However, the case status of this appeal will be updated again once this order is entered.] (SC)21-06038
03/24/2021BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC)21-08461
05/11/2021Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed. (SC).
06/14/2021Order/Dispositional BarFiled Order Approving Conditional Guilty Plea Agreement. "We hereby suspend Brian J. Ramsey from the practice of law for one year commencing from the date of this order, stayed for one year subject o the conditions outlined in the signed conditional guilty plea agreement." fn2[We deny as moot the State Bar's request to strike Ramsey's brief.] NNP21-EC/KP/DH (SC)21-17043
06/23/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Service to the Courts Re: Order Approving Conditional Guilty Plea Agreement. (SC)21-18070
07/09/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)21-19724
07/09/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
08/06/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by Bar Counsel on July 23, 2021. (SC)21-19724