Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 79770-COA
Short Caption:COLEMAN VS. TOMSHECKCourt:Court of Appeals
Related Case(s):79770
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A728692Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Rehearing Denied
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

+ Due Items

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/15/2021Case Status UpdateTransferred from Supreme Court. (COA).
06/28/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." Court of Appeals-MG/JT/BB (COA)21-18521
07/14/2021Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellant's Petition for Rehearing due: July 30, 2021. (SC)21-20219
07/30/2021Filing FeeRehearing Fee Paid. $150.00 from Solomon D. Coleman. Ck# 1444. (COA)
07/30/2021Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Proper Person Petition for Rehearing. (COA)21-22200
09/22/2021Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). Court of Appeals- MG/JT/BB. (COA)21-27369