Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 82358
Short Caption:HOY VS. CASTELLONCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A740718Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:SilverCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:01/22/2021 / Tanksley, ThomasSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/21/2021Filing FeeFiling Fee due for Appeal. (SC)
01/21/2021Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)21-01756
01/21/2021OtherJustice Abbi Silver disqualified from participation in this matter. Disqualification Reason: Lawyers and Judges. (SC)
01/21/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC)21-01760
01/21/2021Filing FeeE-Payment $250.00 from Micah S. Echols. (SC)
01/21/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 21 days. (SC)21-01854
01/22/2021Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Thomas J. Tanksley. (SC)21-01956
02/03/2021Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellant's Docketing Statement due: February 25, 2021. (SC)21-03342
02/17/2021Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Other. The premediation conference is continued because based on communications from both sides, they are arranging a private mediation within the coming weeks. They will be expected to advise the settlement judge of outcome and other important updates. If not settled, the settlement judge will evaluate and file a new ECAR by late March or early April. (SC)21-04595
02/25/2021Docketing StatementFiled Appellant's Civil Docketing Statement. (SC)21-05662
03/16/2021Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Not Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is not appropriate for mediation and should be removed from the settlement program. Per counsel, private mediation was not successful. (SC)21-07563
03/16/2021Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Not Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is not appropriate for mediation and should be removed from the settlement program. Per counsel, private mediation was not successful. (SC)21-07592
03/17/2021Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order Removing From Settlement Program/Briefing Reinstated. This appeal is removed from the settlement program. Appellant(s): 14 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief. (SC)21-07708
03/25/2021Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 10/17/18, 5/14/19, and 6/23/20. To Court Reporter: Kimberly Estala. (SC)21-08512
03/30/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order to Show Cause. Appellant shall have 30 days from the date of this order within which to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. Respondents may file any reply within 14 days from the date that appellant's response is served. Briefing is suspended. (SC)21-09124
04/23/2021Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant's response to the order to show cause is due: May 13, 2021. (SC)21-11702
05/10/2021TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Lisa Lizotte stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 10/17/18, 5/14/19, and 6/23/20.21-13299
05/13/2021MotionFiled Appellant's Response to the Court's March 30, 2021 Order to Show Cause. (SC)21-13870
05/17/2021TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Recorder Gina Villani stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 6/24/2020. (SC)21-14193
05/24/2021MotionFiled Appellant's Motion Supplemental Response to the Court's March 30, 2021 Order to Show Cause. (SC)21-14768
05/27/2021MotionFiled Respondent (Flower Marie Castellon) Reply to Order to Show Cause. (SC)21-15306
06/10/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." NNP21 - EC/KP/DH (SC)21-16669
06/21/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Respondent's (Flower Marie Castellon) Notice of Entry of Order. (SC)21-17819
07/06/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)21-19223
07/06/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
07/23/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on July 7, 2021. (SC)21-19223