Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 82359
Short Caption:IN RE: DISCIPLINE OF JEREMY T. BERGSTROMCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):NONEClassification:Bar Matter - Discipline - Appeal
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:03/08/2021How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/21/2021Filing FeeAppeal Filing fee waived. Bar Matter/Bar Discipline. (SC).
01/21/2021Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record of Bar Proceedings. Vol. I. (SC).21-01757
01/21/2021Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record of Bar Proceedings. Vol. II. (SC).21-01758
01/21/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Briefing Schedule/Bar Discipline. Due date: 30 days. If no opening brief is filed, the matter will be submitted for decision on the record without briefing or oral argument. (SC).21-01762
03/08/2021Case Status UpdateSubmitted for Decision. (SC).
06/07/2021Order/Dispositional BarFiled Order of Suspension. "We hereby suspend attorney Jeremy T. Bergstrom from the practice of law for two years to run consecutive to his suspension imposed in In re Discipline of Bergstrom, Docket No. 79205 (Order Approving Conditional Guilty Plea Agreement, Nov. 14, 2019), which ended on May 15, 2020. Bergstrom shall also retake the Nevada State Bar exam and MPRE and pay Farmers Financial Services $10,433.16 in restitution if he has not done so already." fn2 [The order in Docket No. 79205 required that Bergstrom petition for reinstatement at the end of the actual suspension in that matter. He has never done so. Because the suspension imposed in this matter runs consecutive to the suspension in Docket No. 79205, the suspension herein will be completed on May 15, 2022.] En Banc. (SC).21-16181
06/15/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Notice to the Courts No. 82359. (SC)21-17160
07/02/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)21-19086
07/02/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
07/23/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by Bar Counsel on July 12, 2021. (SC)21-19086