Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 82370
Short Caption:BARRICK GOLD CORP. VS. DIST. CT. (BULLION MONARCH MINING, INC.)Court:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):79652, 83415
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A785913Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Prohibition
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

+ Due Items

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/25/2021Filing FeeFiling fee paid. E-Payment $250.00 from Todd L. Bice. (SC)
01/25/2021Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Prohibition. (SC)Y21-02153
01/25/2021AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume I of VI. (SC)21-02155
01/25/2021AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume II of VI. (SC)21-02156
01/25/2021AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume III of VI. (SC)21-02158
01/25/2021AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume IV of VI. (SC)21-02159
01/25/2021AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume V of VI. (SC)21-02160
01/25/2021AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume VI of VI. (SC)21-02161
01/25/2021MotionFiled Motion to Seal Certain Pages of Appendix in Support of Petitioner Barrick Gold Corporation's Petition for Writ of Prohibition. (SC)21-02170
02/10/2021MotionFiled Real Party in Interest's Motion to Dismiss Petition or Notice of Intent to Oppose Petition as Moot. (SC)21-04022
02/17/2021MotionFiled Petitioner's Opposition to Motion to Dismiss Petition and Countermotion for Stay Pending Decision on Writ Petition. (SC)21-04741
02/24/2021Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Real party in interest's reply to petitioner's opposition filed on February 17, 2021 due: March 10, 2021. (SC)21-05495
03/10/2021MotionFiled Real Party in Interest's Reply to Motion to Dismiss Petition as Moot and Opposition to Countermotion for Stay. (SC)21-07048
03/17/2021MotionFiled Petitioner's Reply in Support of Countermotion for a Stay Pending Decision on Writ Petition. (SC)21-07768
05/10/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Petitioner's Notice of Appearance for Jordan T. Smith. (SC)21-13363
05/10/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Petitioner's Notice of District Court's Order Denying Barrick Gold Corporation's Motion to Dismiss. (SC)21-13364
05/28/2021MotionFiled Petitioner's Motion to Supplement Petition and Appendix Thereto. (SC)21-15400
05/28/2021MotionFiled Petitioner's Motion to File Appendix Volume 1 in Support of Barrick Gold Corporation's Supplement to Petition for Writ of Prohibition Under Seal. (SC)21-15402
07/15/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order Granting Motion to Dismiss Petition. "We grant real party in interest's motion to dismiss the petition." fn1 [In light of this order, we deny petitioner's motion to seal certain pages of the appendix in support of its petition, countermotion for a stay pending decision on writ petition, and motion to supplement petition and appendix thereto.] JH/RP/EC. (SC)21-20380