Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 82372
Short Caption:DANIELS VS. BORKCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Carson City - First Judicial District - 20OC000741BClassification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:01/26/2021 / Wasick, DavidSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/25/2021Filing FeeFiling Fee Waived - State/County/Municipality. (SC)
01/25/2021Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) (SC)21-02223
01/25/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement/Civil. Due date: 10 days. (SC)21-02225
01/25/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. (SC)21-02227
01/25/2021Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Amended. (SC)21-02257
01/26/2021Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: David Wasick. (SC)21-02399
02/01/2021Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Copy of District Court Docket Entries. (SC)21-02992
02/04/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Appellants' Notice of Appearance for D. Randall Gilmer and Frank A. Toddre, II. (SC)21-03377
02/04/2021Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Copy of District Court Docket Entries. (SC)21-03407
02/04/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge for Notice of Appearance. (SC)21-03450
02/04/2021Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Appellant's Case Appeal Statement. (SC)21-03456
02/09/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Appellants' Proof of Service on Settlement Judge. (SC)21-03950
02/16/2021Docketing StatementFiled Appellant's Civil Docketing Statement. (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED ON 2/17/21) (SC)
02/17/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Deficient Docketing Statement. Corrected docketing statement due: 5 days. (SC)21-04615
02/17/2021Docketing StatementFiled Appellant's Civil Docketing Statement. (SC)21-04730
02/25/2021Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Not Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is not appropriate for mediation. (SC)21-05654
02/26/2021Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order Removing From Settlement Program/Briefing Reinstated. This appeal is removed from the settlement program. Appellant(s): 14 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief. (SC)21-05740
03/08/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order to Show Cause. Appellant's Response due: 30 days. The deadlines for filing documents in this appeal shall be suspended pending further order of this court. Respondent may file any reply within 14 days from the date that appellants' response is served. (SC)21-06623
04/07/2021MotionFiled Appellants' Response to Order to Show Cause. (SC)21-10052
04/07/2021AppendixFiled Appellants' Appendix in Support of Response to Order to Show Cause. (SC)21-10070
04/21/2021MotionFiled Respondent's Reply to Order to Show Cause. (SC)21-11575
04/21/2021AppendixFiled Respondent's Appendix in Support of Reply to Order to Show Cause. Vol. 1. (SC)21-11576
05/11/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." NNP21 - EC/KP/DH (SC)21-13452
06/07/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)21-16174
06/07/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
06/18/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on June 9, 2021. (SC)21-16174