Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 80856-COA
Short Caption:RIGA, III VS. MCNABBCourt:Court of Appeals
Related Case(s):80856, 81310, 81310-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A756346Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/25/2021Case Status UpdateTransferred from Supreme Court. (COA).
05/25/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." Court of Appeals-MG/JT/BB (COA)21-14967
06/11/2021Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant's petition for rehearing due: June 28, 2021. (COA)21-16794
06/28/2021Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Appellant's Petition for Rehearing. (COA)21-18610
06/28/2021Filing FeeFiling fee paid. E-Payment $150.00 from Nicolas M. Bui. (COA)
07/21/2021Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). (COA)21-21052
08/05/2021Case Status UpdateTransferred to Supreme Court. (COA)
08/05/2021Case Status UpdateCase Closed. (COA)