Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 82027-COA
Short Caption:GOBER (ADAM) VS. STATECourt:Court of Appeals
Related Case(s):71264, 71264-COA, 81694, 81695, 81979, 82027, 82204, 82235
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C313160
Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A790041
Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/25/2021Case Status UpdateTransferred from Supreme Court. (SC).
03/22/2021MotionFiled Proper Person Appellant's Motion for Appointment of Counsel. (COA)21-08154
03/22/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Provide Proof of Service. Due date: 10 days. (COA)21-08156
04/12/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." fn1 [We have reviewed all documents Gober has filed in this matter, and we conclude no relief based upon those submissions is warranted.] Court of Appeals- MG/JT/BB. (COA)21-10463
05/03/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Proper Person Appellant's Notice of Intention to File Petition for Rehearing. (TRANSFERRED TO THE SUPREME COURT PER 5/13/21 ORDER) (COA)21-12670
05/13/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellant has now filed a pro se "Notice of Appeal" in which he informs this court that he intends to appeal the order of affirmance and asks that "this notice of appeal" be forwarded to the appropriate court. It appears from his filing that appellant intended to file a petition for review of this court's April 12, 2021, order. See NRAP 40B. Accordingly, the clerk shall transfer the notice of appeal to the Supreme Court and docket it as a petition for review. The clerk shall file this order in both courts. (COA)21-13765
05/13/2021Case Status UpdateTransferred to Supreme Court. (COA)
05/13/2021Case Status UpdateCase Closed