Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 82381
Short Caption:BRUNSON VS. STATE, DEP'T OF BUS. AND INDUS.Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A791147Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:02/04/2021 / Trost, JanetSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/26/2021Filing FeeFiling Fee due for Appeal. (SC)
01/26/2021Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)21-02383
01/26/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC)21-02385
02/02/2021Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Lipson Neilson. Check no. 1362. (SC)
02/02/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 21 days. (SC)21-03216
02/04/2021Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Janet Trost. (SC)21-03406
02/12/2021Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Not Appropriate for Settlement Program. Filed in error - SJ will file correct report. (SC)
02/12/2021Settlement Program ReportFiled Amended ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for March 24, 2021, at 1:00 PM. (SC)21-04359
02/23/2021Docketing StatementFiled Appellant's Docketing Statement Civil Appeal. (SC)21-05372
03/25/2021Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. (SC)21-08644
03/26/2021Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant(s): 14 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief and appendix. (SC)21-08719
04/07/2021MotionFiled Respondents' Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. (SC)21-10064
04/09/2021Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 10/07/20 and 12/16/20. To Court Reporter: Shawna Ortega (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED 04/09/21). (SC)
04/09/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Deficient Transcript Request. (SC)21-10265
04/12/2021Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 10/7/20 and 12/16/20. To Court Reporter: Unknown. (SC)21-10428
04/14/2021MotionFiled Appellant's Response to Respondent's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. (SC)21-10837
04/21/2021MotionFiled Respondent's Reply to Appellant's Response to Respondent's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. (SC)21-11492
05/07/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDERS this appeal DISMISSED." SNP21-RP/LS/AS (SC)21-13112
06/02/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)21-15652
06/02/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
06/18/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on June 3, 2021. (SC)21-15652