Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 82386
Short Caption:IN RE: PARENTAL RIGHTS AS TO B.A.Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - FV1901379Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Parental Termination
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:
Expedited

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/26/2021Filing FeeFiling Fee due for Appeal. (SC)
01/26/2021Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Parental Termination/Counsel. Filed certified copy of notice of appeal. (SEALED) (SC)
01/26/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC)21-02413
01/27/2021Filing FeeE-Payment $250.00 from Jennifer S. Anderson. (SC)
01/29/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Regarding Deadlines/Parental Termination with Counsel. Docketing statement mailed to appellant's counsel. (SC)
02/10/2021Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 9/8/20. To Court Reporter: Litigation Services. (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED ON 2/10/21).(SC)
02/10/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Deficient Transcript Request. (SC)
02/11/2021Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 09/08/20. To Court Reporter: Litigation Services, Sunshine Reporting. (SC)
02/19/2021Docketing StatementFiled Appellant's Civil Docketing Statement. (SC)
03/12/2021TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Christina Amundson stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 9/8/20. (SC)
04/27/2021Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant's opening brief and appendix due: May 13, 2021. (SC)21-12087
05/12/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Appellant's Notice of Withdrawal of Appeal. (SC)21-13644
05/13/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order/Voluntary Dismissal. Cause appearing, appellant's motion for a voluntary dismissal of this appeal is granted. This appeal is dismissed. Case Closed/No Remittitur Issued. (SC)21-13828