Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 82392
Short Caption:SPORTSMAN'S ROYAL MANOR, LLC VS. ANSARACourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A728471Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:02/05/2021 / Haire, PaulSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/27/2021Filing FeeFiling Fee due for Appeal. (SC)
01/27/2021Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)21-02518
01/27/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC)21-02520
01/29/2021Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled (SEALED) Confidential Sealed Minutes. (SC)
02/03/2021Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Amended/Supplemental. (SC)21-03301
02/03/2021Filing FeeE-Payment $250.00 from Joel D. Henriod. (SC)
02/04/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 21 days. (SC)21-03391
02/05/2021Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Paul M. Haire. (SC)21-03576
02/05/2021Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Confidential Envelope Containing (SEALED) Minutes. (SC)
02/23/2021Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for May 3, 2021, at 9:30 AM. (SC)21-05307
02/26/2021Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellant's Docketing Statement due: March 11, 2021. (SC)21-05701
03/11/2021Docketing StatementFiled Appellant's Civil Docketing Statement. (SC)21-07211
03/30/2021Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Other. Upon further consultation with counsel pursuant to NRAP 16(b), the settlement judge recommends this case be removed from the settlement program. (SC)21-09104
03/30/2021Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order Removing From Settlement Program/Briefing Reinstated. This appeal is removed from the settlement program. Appellant(s): 14 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief. (SC)21-09231
07/12/2021MotionFiled Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. (SC)21-19998
07/19/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order/Stipulated Dismissal. Order Dismissing Appeal. "This appeal is dismissed without prejudice to the parties' right to seek reinstatement if the relief sought in the district court is not granted." The parties shall bear their own fees and costs. Case Closed/No Remittitur Issued. fn1 [Any motion to reinstate this appeal must be filed within 28 days of entry of the district court's order denying the requested relief.] (SC)21-20669