Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 82400
Short Caption:BARRAL (DUSTIN) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):64135, 74288, 74288-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C269095Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Other/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/28/2021Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee Waived. Criminal. (SC)
01/28/2021Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)21-02670
02/09/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Filing of Brief. Order Directing Transmission of Record. Record on Appeal due: 30 days. Within 120 days, appellant may file either (1) a brief that complies with the requirements in NRAP 28(a) and NRAP 32; or (2) the "Informal Brief Form for Pro Se Parties" provided by the supreme court clerk. NRAP 31(a)(1). If no brief is submitted, the appeal may be decided on the record on appeal. (SC).21-03901
02/18/2021Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Volumes 1-6. (SC)21-04805
02/25/2021Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal. (SEALED) pages 1-23, 1054-1057, and 117-1179. (SC)
02/25/2021Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal. (SEALED) pages 168-174. (SC)
02/25/2021Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal. (SEALED) pages 1044-1051. (SC)
04/20/2021MotionFiled Proper Person Motion to Withdraw Appeal. (SC)21-11444
05/14/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order/Voluntary Dismissal. Appellant's motion for a voluntary dismissal of this appeal is granted. "This appeal is dismissed." Case Closed/No Remittitur Issued. NNP21 - EC/KP/DH (SC)21-13904