Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 82408
Short Caption:CRUISE (ROBERT) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):81464
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C345056Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/29/2021Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee Waived. Criminal. (SC)
01/29/2021Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Fast Track. Filed certified copy of proper person notice of appeal. (Fast track notice issued to trial counsel.) (SC)21-02841
02/05/2021Fast Track BriefFiled Appellant's Fast Track Statement. (REJECTED PER NOTICE FILED ON 2/5/21) (SC)
02/05/2021Transcript RequestFiled Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 3/31/20, 4/21/20, 5/5/20, 7/14/20, 8/11/20, 9/22/20, 10/6/20, 10/22/20, 11/19/20, 11/24/20, 12/8/20, 12/22/20, 1/7/21, 1/12/21, and 1/19/21. (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED ON 1/5/21). (SC)21-03569
02/05/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Deficient Fast Track Document/Criminal. Corrected document due: 5 days. (SC)21-03624
02/05/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Deficient Transcript Request. (SC)21-03641
02/24/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing the Filing of Rough Draft Transcript Request Form and Fast Track Statement and Appendix. (SC)21-05454
03/05/2021Transcript RequestFiled Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 3/31/20, 4/21/20, 5/5/20, 7/14/20, 8/11/20, 9/22/20, 10/6/20, 10/22/20, 11/19/20, 11/24/20, 12/8/20, 12/22/20, 1/7/21, 1/12/21, and 1/19/21. Court Reporter: Unknown. (REJECTED PER NOTICE FILED ON 3/5/21) (SC)
03/05/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Rejection of Filed Document. (SC)21-06483
04/02/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Conditionally Imposing Sanctions. Conditional sanction of $250 due: 14 days or rough draft transcript request form and the fast track statement and appendix, or a motion to extend time due: 14 days. (SC)21-09604
04/20/2021MotionFiled Motion to Stay Proceedings for Ninety (90) days. (REJECTED PER NOTICE FILED ON 4/20/21) (SC)21-11419
04/20/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Of Rejection - No Notice Of Appearance. (SC)21-11466
04/26/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Appellant's Notice of Appearance for Betsy Allen. (SC)21-11924
04/26/2021MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Stay Proceedings for Ninety (90) days. (SC)21-11925
04/29/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Attorney Spencer M. Judd failure to comply with this court's rules, notices, and orders has forced this court to divert its limited resources to ensure his compliance and needlessly delayed the processing of this appeal. Therefore, the $250 sanction is no longer conditional and must be paid. Mr. Judd shall have 7 days from the date of this order to file proof of payment in this court. Further, Mr. Judd is removed as counsel in this appeal. This court refers Mr. Judd to the State Bar of Nevada for investigation pursuant to SCR 104-105. Bar Counsel's Report due: 90 days. The clerk shall add attorney Betsy Allen as counsel of record for appellant. Ms. Allen shall have 7 days from the date of this order to serve and file, in this court, a file-stamped transcript request form. Ms. Allen shall have until July 15, 2021, to file and serve the fast track statement and appendix. (SC)21-12324
05/10/2021Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 12/9/20 and 1/12/21 To Court Reporter: Unknown. (REJECTED PER NOTICE FILED ON 5/10/21) (SC)
05/10/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Rejection of Filed Document. (SC)21-13269
05/11/2021MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Transcript Request Form. (SC)21-13399
05/11/2021Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 12/9/20 and 1/12/21 To Court Reporter: Unknown. (REJECTED PER NOTICE FILED ON 5/11/21) (SC)21-13400
05/11/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Deficient Transcript Request. (SC)21-13426
05/11/2021Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 12/9/20 and 1/12/21. To Court Recorder for District 21. (SC)21-13563
05/13/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Despite its untimeliness, appellant's motion for an extension of time to file the transcript request form is granted. The transcript request form was filed on May 11, 2021. (SC)21-13835
06/01/2021TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Robin Page stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 1/12/21. (SC)21-15538
06/01/2021TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Robin Page stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 12/2/19. (SC)21-15540
06/29/2021MotionFiled Appellant Robert Cruise's Motion to Withdraw Appeal. (SC)21-18685
06/29/2021MotionFiled Supplemental Affidavit in Support of Robert Cruise's Motion to Withdraw Appeal. (SC)21-18686
07/01/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order/Voluntary Dismissal. Appellant elects to stop the appellate process. ORDER this appeal DISMISSED. Case Closed/No Remittitur Issued. NNP21-EC/KP/DH (SC)21-18987
08/23/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Mr. Judd shall have 14 days from the date of this order to pay the monetary sanctions to the Supreme Court Law Library and provide the clerk of this court with proof of payment of the sanctions, or show cause why he should not be sanctioned further. The court's April 29, 2021, order also directed the State Bar to inform this court of the status or results of the investigation and any disciplinary proceedings within 90 days. To date, the State Bar has failed to comply with this court's order. The State Bar shall have 14 days from the date of this order to file the status report. (SC)21-24518
08/27/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Payment of Sanction. Check for $250, paid May 5, 2021. (SC).21-24960
08/27/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On April 29, 2021, this court entered an order directing, among other things, attorney Spencer Judd to pay a $250 sanction to the Supreme Court Law Library and file proof of payment in this court by May 6, 2021. No proof of payment was timely filed. On August 23, 2021, this court entered an order directing Mr. Judd to pay the sanction and provide the clerk with proof of payment, or show cause why he should not be sanctioned further. On August 27, 2021, Mr. Judd filed a copy of the check used to pay the sanction. The check is dated May 5, 2021. It appears that the Supreme Court Law Library received the check and payment has been processed. Accordingly, no further action is required from Mr. Judd. The State Bar of Nevada's status report remains due to be filed by September 7, 2021, as directed in the August 23, 2021, order. (SC)21-25000
09/08/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Investigative Report. Investigative Report from the State Bar of Nevada re: attorney Spencer Judd. Original report was placed in attorney's bar file. (SC).