Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 81409-COA
Short Caption:PERTGEN (WES) VS. WARDENCourt:Court of Appeals
Related Case(s):81163, 81409
Lower Court Case(s):White Pine Co. - Seventh Judicial District - HC-1907020Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
02/01/2021Case Status UpdateTransferred from Supreme Court. (COA).
03/12/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Proper Person Appellant's Notice of Change of Address. (COA)21-07238
03/30/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Proper Person Appellant's Second Notice of Change of Address. (COA)21-09196
04/23/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." Court of Appeals-MG/JT/BB (COA)21-11757
05/05/2021MotionFiled Proper Person Appellant's Motion for Thirty (30) Days Enlargement of Time to File a Petition for Rehearing; Petition for Rehearing En Banc. (COA)21-12916
05/05/2021MotionFiled Proper Person Appellant's Motion for Stay of Issuance of Remittitur. (COA)21-12920
05/13/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellant has filed pro se motions for an extension of time to file a "Petition for Rehearing; Petition for Rehearing En Banc" and to stay issuance of the remittitur pending disposition of his petition. Cause appearing, the motion for an extension of time is granted to the following extent. Appellant shall have until June 10, 2021, to file and serve a petition for rehearing in this court, see NRAP 40, or a petition for review in the Supreme Court of Nevada, see NRAP 40B. The remittitur will be automatically stayed if appellant timely files a petition for rehearing or petition for review. See NRAP 41(b)(1), (2). This court declines to stay issuance of the remittitur to any greater extent at this time. (COA)21-13785
05/25/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Proper Person Appellant's Notice Regarding Case. (COA)21-14946
06/08/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellant has filed a pro se document requesting that this court send him file-stamped copies of the motions filed in this court on May 5, 2021. This court declines to provide appellant with file-stamped copies of the motions. However, the clerk of this court shall provide appellant with a copy of the docket sheet. Any other relief requested is denied. (COA)21-16302
06/08/2021Case Status UpdateTransferred to Supreme Court. (COA)
06/08/2021Case Status UpdateCase Closed. (COA)