Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 81656-COA
Short Caption:STONE (RANDY) VS. STATECourt:Court of Appeals
Related Case(s):42738, 48710, 62573, 63380, 72141, 72141-COA, 81656, 83222
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C178669Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Other/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
02/01/2021Case Status UpdateTransferred from Supreme Court. (COA).
04/12/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." Court of Appeals-MG/JT/BB (COA)21-10480
04/29/2021Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Proper Person Petition for Rehearing. (COA)21-12340
06/15/2021Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). Court of Appeals- MG/JT/BB. (COA)21-17285
07/12/2021Case Status UpdateTransferred to Supreme Court. (COA)
07/12/2021Case Status UpdateCase Closed. (COA)