Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 82429
Short Caption:180 LAND CO., LLC VS. CITY OF LAS VEGASCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A780184Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:HerndonCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:Exempt
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
02/02/2021Filing FeeFiling Fee due for Appeal. (SC)
02/02/2021Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)21-03233
02/02/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC)21-03236
02/02/2021OtherJustice Douglas W. Herndon disqualified from participation in this matter. Disqualification Reason: Sat in District Court Proceedings. (SC)
02/16/2021Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Kermitt L. Waters. Check no. 2456. (SC)
02/16/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellants - due: 21 days. (SC)21-04407
02/18/2021Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Exemption from Settlement Program. It has been determined that this appeal will not be assigned to the settlement program. Appellants: 14 days transcript request form; 120 days opening brief. (SC)21-04844
03/09/2021Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (SC)21-06814
03/16/2021Docketing StatementFiled Respondent City of Las Vegas' Response to Appellant's Docketing Statement. (SC)21-07651
03/25/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order to FIle Amended Docketing Statement and to Show Cause. Appellants' amended docketing statement due: 14 days. Appellants shall have 30 days from the date of this order within which to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. Respondent may file any reply within 14 days from the date that appellants' response is served. Briefing is suspended. (SC)21-08592
04/06/2021Docketing StatementFiled Amended Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (SC)21-09913
04/26/2021MotionFiled Appellants' NRAP 26.1 Disclosure and Response to Order to File Amended Docketing Statement and to Show Cause. (SC)21-11969
04/30/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order Admonishing Counsel and Dismissing Appeal. (THIS ORDER IS VACATED PER THE ORDER FILED 5/7/20.) (SC)21-12494
05/07/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Vacating Order. On April 30, 2021, this court entered an order dismissing this appeal and admonishing appellants' counsel for failing to file an amended docketing statement with copies of all required documents attached. It now appears that counsel did attach the required documents to the amended docketing statement but due to a combination of technical difficulties and a scanning error, those documents did not appear to be attached when this court's order was entered. Accordingly, we vacate our April 30, 2021, order. (SC)21-13116
05/07/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDERS this appeal DISMISSED." SNP21-RP/LS/AS (SC)21-13117
06/02/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)21-15653
06/02/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
06/18/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on June 3, 2021. (SC)21-15653