Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 82434
Short Caption:NOVICK VS. SUMMERLIN N. CMTY. ASS'NCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):83351
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A788545Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Proper Person
Disqualifications:HerndonCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Senior Justice None for Justice HerndonPanel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
02/03/2021Filing FeeFiling Fee due for Appeal. (SC)
02/03/2021Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)21-03336
02/03/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC)21-03339
02/19/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Proper Person Notice of Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. (SC)21-04989
02/25/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On February 19, 2021, appellants filed with this court a copy of the motion to proceed in forma pauperis that was filed in the district court on February 1, 2021. The district court shall, within 30 days of the date of this order, enter a written order resolving the motion in compliance with NRAP 24. (SC)21-05528
03/23/2021Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order. Certified copy of (SEALED) Order Granting Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, Filed in District Court on March 12, 2021. (SC)
03/24/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Waiving Filing Fee. In light of the district court's March 12, 2021 order granting appellants' motion to proceed in forma pauperis, no filing fee is due for this appeal. (SC)21-08398
03/24/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Regarding Deadlines. (SC)21-08411
04/08/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Notice of Voluntary Recusal for Justice Herndon. (SC)21-10184
04/08/2021OtherJustice Douglas W. Herndon disqualified from participation in this matter. Disqualification Reason: Voluntary Recusal. (SC)
04/08/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDERS this appeal DISMISSED." EC/KP. (SC)21-10187
05/03/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)21-12561
05/03/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
07/23/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on July 6, 2021. (SC)21-12561