Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 82436
Short Caption:EASTERDAY (MITCHELL) VS. DIST. CT. (STATE)Court:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):81976
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR182190Classification:Original Proceeding - Criminal - Mandamus
Disqualifications:Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
02/04/2021Filing FeePetition Filing Fee Waived. Criminal. (SC)
02/04/2021Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Mandamus. (SC)21-03384
02/04/2021AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ. (SC)21-03385
02/04/2021MotionFiled Motion to Forward Presentence Investigation Report to this Court. (SC)21-03386
02/09/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion to Transmit Presentence Investigation Report. Presentence Investigation Report due: 14 days. (SC).21-03912
02/17/2021Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled (SEALED) Presentence Investigation Report. (SC)
04/07/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Answer. Answer due: 28 days. (SC)21-09952
04/30/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Real Party in Interest Notice of Appearance for Kevin Naughton. (SC)21-12499
04/30/2021Petition/WritFiled Real Party in Interest Answer to Petition for Writ. (SC)21-12500
05/04/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Petitioner's Notice of Election Not to File a Reply Brief. (SC)21-12768
07/15/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order Granting Petition. "ORDER the petition GRANTED AND DIRECT THE CLERK OF THIS COURT TO ISSUE A WRIT OF MANDAMUS instructing the district court to vacate its order denying petitioner's motion to set aside his judgment of conviction and enter an order granting the request." JH/RP/EC. (SC)21-20379
07/15/2021WritIssued Writ with letter. Original and one copy of writ and copy of order mailed to Attorney John Reese Petty for service upon Judge David A. Hardy. (SC)21-20388
07/23/2021WritFiled Returned Writ. Original Writ returned. Served on Judge David A. Hardy on July 21st, 2021. (SC)21-21352
07/26/2021Order/IncomingFiled District court order. Certified copy of Order Vacating and Order Setting Aside Conviction filed in district court on July 26th, 2021. (SC)21-21591
08/09/2021RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur (SC)21-23019
08/09/2021Case Status UpdateNotice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)