Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Combined Case Information: 81867-COA & 81867
Short Caption:O'KEEFE (BRIAN) VS. STATECourt:Court of Appeals & Supreme Court
Related Case(s):44372, 48673, 49329, 65040, 66785, 81867
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A811284Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Other/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/01/2020Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee Waived. Criminal. (SC)
10/01/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)20-36141
10/08/2020Order/IncomingFiled District court order. Certified copy of order filed in district court on 09/25/20. Findings of Fact, Conclusions of Law and Order. (SC)20-36977
10/16/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Transmission of Record and Regarding Briefing. Record on Appeal due: 30 days. Within 120 days, appellant may file either (1) a brief that complies with the requirements in NRAP 28(a) and NRAP 32; or (2) the "Informal Brief Form for Pro Se Parties" provided by the supreme court clerk. NRAP 31(a)(1). If no brief is submitted, the appeal may be decided on the record on appeal. (SC)20-38090
10/28/2020Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal - Volume 1. (SC)20-39545
11/03/2020Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal pages 8-11 and 43. (SEALED). (SC)
11/04/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. (Second NOA) (SC)20-40150
11/18/2020BriefFiled Proper Person Appellant's Informal Brief. (SC)20-42187
12/04/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Proper Person Appellant's Request Submission for Decision Where Briefing is Completed. (SC)20-44023
12/04/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Provide Proof of Service. Due date: 10 days.20-44025
12/15/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Proper Person Notice and Response to the Clerk's Document No. 20-44025 Where Appellant Made Mistake Prematurely Submitting Before 30 Day Period Ended. (SC)20-45465
12/28/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On December 4, 2020, appellant filed a motion requesting that this appeal be submitted for decision. On December 15, 2020, appellant filed a notice stating that the request to submit this appeal for decision is premature. Appellant filed his informal brief on November 18, 2020. Respondent need not file a response unless ordered to do so by this court. Appellant's appeal will be resolved as this court's docket permits. fn1[Given this order, appellant need not file a certificate of service for the pro se motion filed on December 4, 2020.] (SC)20-46572
01/07/2021Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/Submitted For Decision/To Screening. (SC)
01/07/2021MotionFiled Proper Person Appellant's Motion to Take Judicial Notice of This Court's Own Document, SCN Case Number 53859, Supplied Invoking NRS 47.150(2) Whereby Verified Credible Factual Matter - NRS 47.130(1) - Demonstrates O'Keefe was Convicted of 2004 Burglary for Entering Into the Couple's Joint Dwelling and for Order to Issue for Response (See affidavit attached) (See Exhibit 1 Attached - 2 pages). (SC) (TRANSFERRED TO THE COURT OF APPEALS PER 02/08/21 NOTICE).21-00448
02/08/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Transfer Case to Court of Appeals. (SC).21-03717
02/08/2021Case Status UpdateTransferred to Court of Appeals. (SC).
02/08/2021Case Status UpdateTransferred from Supreme Court. (COA).
02/08/2021MotionFiled Proper Person Appellant's Motion to Take Judicial Notice of This Court's Own Document, SCN Case Number 53859, Supplied Invoking NRS 47.150(2) Whereby Verified Credible Factual Matter - NRS 47.130(1) - Demonstrates O'Keefe was Convicted of 2004 Burglary for Entering Into the Couple's Joint Dwelling and for Order to Issue for Response (See affidavit attached) (See Exhibit 1 Attached - 2 pages). (TRANSFERRED FROM THE SUPREME COURT PER 02/08/21 NOTICE). (COA).21-03719
04/23/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." fn1[We have reviewed all documents O'Keefe has filed in this matter, and we conclude that no relief based upon those submissions is warranted.] Court of Appeals-MG/JT/BB (COA)21-11759
04/23/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." fn1[We have reviewed all documents O'Keefe has filed in this matter, and we conclude that no relief based upon those submissions is warranted.] Court of Appeals-MG/JT/BB (SC)
05/03/2021Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Proper Person Appellant's Petition for Rehearing. (COA)21-12665
06/15/2021Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). Court of Appeals- MG/JT/BB. (COA)21-17287
06/22/2021MotionFiled Proper Person Appellant's Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Material Fact for Petition for Rehearing Overlooked Where Pro Per Appellant Beseeches This Honorable Court to Recognize NRS 34.960 3(b) and 4(b)(2) Where Judge Kephart Exercised and Issued Order Pursuant NRS 34.970 Based on True Unreasonable Diligence By Then Trial Counsel. (COA)21-17929
07/01/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. Appellant has filed a pro se motion for leave to file a supplement to his petition for rehearing. As the petition for rehearing was denied on June 15, 2021, the motion is denied as moot. (COA)21-19005
07/01/2021Case Status UpdateTransferred to Supreme Court. (COA)
07/01/2021Case Status UpdateTransferred from Court of Appeals. (SC)
07/01/2021Case Status UpdateCase Closed. (COA)
07/01/2021Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Proper Person Appellant's Petition for Review Pursuant NRAP 40B Where Both Decisions by the Court of Appeals Conflict and Disavow the Dispositive Issue Set in 2014 Under White When Appellant's Trial Was in 2004 and Issue Had Never Been Decided Until the Supreme Court's Decision in 2014. (SC)21-19007
07/13/2021Post-Judgment Order/DispositionalFiled Order Denying Petition for Review. "Review denied." EN BANC (SC)21-20088
07/13/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)21-20089
07/13/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
07/23/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on July 14, 2021. (SC)21-20089