Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Combined Administrative Case: ADKT 0576
Short Caption:IN RE: THE MATTER OF THE CREATION OF A COMMISSION TO STUDY THE ADJUDICATION OF WATER LAW CASESCourt:Supreme Court
Classification:Administrative - ADKT - ADKTCase Status:ADKT Order Filed
Filed Date:02/08/2021Public Hearing:
Closed Date:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
02/08/2021Administrative CaseFiled Petition.21-03733
02/08/2021Administrative CaseFiled Order Scheduling Public Hearing.21-03790
02/09/2021Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Hon. Gary D. Fairman.21-03827
02/22/2021Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Deserea Quintana, Executive Director, Inter-Tribal Council of Nevada, Inc.21-05184
02/23/2021Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Gordon H. DePaoli.21-05294
02/23/2021Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Vidler Water Company, Inc.21-05309
02/23/2021Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Bradley Crowell.21-05333
02/23/2021Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Adam Sullivan.21-05334
02/26/2021Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Rusty Jardine.21-05773
02/26/2021Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Michael A.T. Pagni.21-05799
03/01/2021Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Mark Force.21-05898
03/02/2021Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Michael J. DeMartini.21-06018
03/03/2021Administrative CasePublic Hearing Held. Public Hearing held on the Administrative Docket. (SC)
03/09/2021Administrative CaseFiled Order Creating Commission to Study the Adjudication of Water Law Cases.21-06849
03/30/2021Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Members to the Commission to Study the Adjudication of Water Law Cases.21-09169
04/23/2021Administrative CaseFiled Letter from Jon McMasters.21-11799
04/26/2021Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Members to the Commission to Study the Adjudication of Water Law Cases and Correcting Membership.21-11916