Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 82453
Short Caption:KIDS & HORSES VS. DIST. CT. (PAVLAKIS)Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Douglas Co. - Ninth Judicial District - 19-CV-0227Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus/Prohibition
Disqualifications:Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
02/09/2021Filing FeeFiling fee paid. E-Payment $250.00 from Bradley Paul Elley. (SC)
02/09/2021Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Mandamus or, in the Alternative, Prohibition. (SC)21-03908
02/09/2021AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 1. (SC)21-03909
02/09/2021AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 2. (SC)21-03910
02/26/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Answer. Answer due: 28 days. Petitioner shall have 14 days from service of the answer to file and serve any reply. (SC)21-05755
03/16/2021Petition/WritFiled Answer of Real Party in Interest. (SC)21-07578
03/30/2021Petition/WritFiled Petitioners' Reply to Real Party in Interest's Answering Brief to Petition for Writ of Mandamus or, in the Alternative, Prohibition. (SC)21-09269
07/22/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Submitting for Decision Without Oral Argument. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this petition shall stand submitted for decision to the Northern Nevada Panel as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. (SC)21-21216
07/22/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order Denying Petition for a Writ of Mandamus or Prohibition. "ORDER the petition DENIED." NNP21 - EC/KP/DH (SC)21-21217
09/08/2021RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. (SC)21-26040
09/08/2021Case Status UpdateNotice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)