Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 82463
Short Caption:IN RE: DISCIPLINE OF KELLY HUANGCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):NONEClassification:Bar Matter - Discipline - Appeal
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:03/16/2021How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
02/10/2021Filing FeeFiling Fee Waived. Bar Matter/Bar Discipline. (SC).
02/10/2021Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record of Bar Proceedings. Vol. 1, Pages 140-208. (SEALED). (SC).
02/10/2021Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record of Bar Proceedings. Vol. 2, Pages 631-706 and 843-933. (SEALED). (SC).
02/10/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Briefing Schedule/Bar Discipline. Due date: 30 days. If no opening brief is filed, the matter will be submitted for decision on the record without briefing or oral argument. (SC).21-04050
02/11/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The parties shall have 7 days from the date of this order to identify a rule that specifically provides that this matter is confidential or to show good cause for all or part of the record before this court to be sealed. Absent either showing, the record filed on February 10, 2021, will be made public. (SC)21-04179
02/16/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Joint Response to February 11, 2021 Order. (SC)21-04455
03/02/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order. This court directs as follows. Pages 140-208 of volume I of the record on appeal shall remain sealed. The clerk of this court shall unseal the remainder of volume I of the record and file it on this court's public docket. The clerk shall unseal Volume II of the record, with the exception of pages 631-706 and 843-933, and file it on the public docket. The parties shall have 7 days from the date of this order to provide this court with a redacted version of the transcript located at pages 631-706 of volume II. Failure to provide a redacted copy will result in the transcript being made public in its entirety. (SC)21-06048
03/02/2021Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record of Bar Proceedings. Vol. 1. (Pages 140-208 removed per order 3/2/21).21-06050
03/02/2021Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record of Bar Proceedings. Vol. 2. (Pages 631-706 and 843-933 removed per order 3/2/21).21-06051
03/05/2021Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record of Discipline Hearing, Pleadings and Transcript of Hearing - Volume I. (SC)21-06567
03/05/2021Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record of Discipline Hearing, Pleadings and Transcript of Hearing - Volume II (Redacted Version). (SC)21-06568
03/16/2021Case Status UpdateSubmitted for Decision. (SC).
04/16/2021Order/Dispositional BarFiled Order Approving Conditional Guilty Plea Agreement. "We hereby suspend Kelly Huang from the practice of law for six months from the date of this order, stayed for one year subject to the following conditions." NNP21-EC/KP/DH. (SC).21-11069
04/20/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Service to the Courts Re: Order Approving Conditional Guilty Plea Agreement. (SC)21-11383
05/11/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)21-13499
05/11/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
06/07/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by Bar Counsel on May 19, 2021. (SC)21-13499