Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 82472
Short Caption:SOONG, M.D. VS. DIST. CT. (MANUKYAN)Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A820157Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus
Disqualifications:Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
02/16/2021Filing FeeFiling fee paid. E-Payment $250.00 from Alice Campos Mercado. (SC)
02/16/2021Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Mandamus. (SC)21-04388
02/16/2021AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ. (SC)21-04389
02/16/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Filing of Petition for Writ. (SC)21-04464
03/05/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Answer. Answer due: 28 days. Petitioner shall have 14 days from service of the answer to file and serve any reply. (SC)21-06489
04/02/2021BriefFiled Real Party In Interest's Answer to Petition for Writ of Mandamus. (REJECTED PER NOTICE). (SC)
04/05/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Deficient Brief. Corrected answering brief due: 5 days. (SC)21-09687
04/05/2021BriefFiled Real Party In Interest's Answer to Petition for Writ of Mandamus. (SC)21-09814
04/16/2021Petition/WritFiled Petitioner's Reply in Support of Petition for Writ of Mandamus. (SC)21-11074
07/12/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order Granting Petition for Writ of Mandamus. "ORDER petition GRANTED AND DIRECT THE CLERK OF THIS COURT TO ISSUE A WRIT OF MANDAMUS instructing the district court to grant Dr. Soong's motion to dismiss due to the defective declarations." fn2[The Honorable Mark Gibbons, Senior Justice, participated in the decision of this matter under a general order of assignment.] JH/RP/MG (SC)21-19990
07/19/2021WritFiled Returned Writ. Original Writ returned. Served on Judge Jessica Peterson on July 15, 2021. (SC)21-20752
08/06/2021RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur (SC)21-22929
08/06/2021Case Status UpdateNotice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed (SC)