Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 82473
Short Caption:LUCIA (CHARLES) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C340528Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
02/16/2021Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee Waived. Criminal. (SC)
02/16/2021Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Fast Track. Filed certified copy of proper person notice of appeal. (Fast track notice issued to trial counsel.) (SC)21-04408
02/16/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Request Rough Draft Transcripts. Due date: 10 days. (SC)21-04411
02/26/2021Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 01/14/21. To Court Reporter: Vanessa Medina (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED 02/25/21). (SC)
02/26/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Deficient Transcript Request. (SC)21-05715
02/26/2021Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 01/14/21. To Court Reporter: Vanessa Medina. (SC)21-05785
02/26/2021MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Withdraw as Attorney of Record. (SC)21-05824
03/02/2021OtherReturned Unfiled Document - Proper Person Letter. (SC)21-06163
03/04/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. Appellant's counsel has filed a motion to withdraw as counsel of record. The motion is denied. The fast track statement and appendix remain due to be filed on or before March 29, 2021. (SC)21-06384
03/23/2021OtherReturned Unfiled Document - Letter Regarding Case. (SC)21-08346
03/26/2021Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. (SC)21-08795
03/26/2021AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement - Volume 1. (SC)21-08796
03/29/2021MotionFiled Attorney Steven M. Altig, Esq.'s Motion to Withdraw as Attorney of Record.21-08940
04/14/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance (John T. Niman, Deputy District Attorney as counsel for Respondent). (SC)21-10784
04/14/2021Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. (SC)21-10785
05/07/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion to Withdraw and Remanding for Counsel. Attorney Steven M. Altig's motion to withdraw as counsel of record for appellant in this appeal is granted. District Court Order Appointing Counsel for Appellant due: 30 days. Briefing is suspended. (SC)21-13119
05/21/2021Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Second Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. (SC)21-14647
05/25/2021Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order Appointing Counsel. Filed certified copy of minute order filed in district court on May 20, 2021 appointing Michael Miceli as counsel for appellant. (SC)21-14880
05/26/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Reinstating Briefing. The clerk of this court shall add Michael Miceli and the law firm of Pitaro & Fumo to the docket as counsel for appellant. Respondent shall have 21 days from the date of this order to file and serve the fast track response. (SC)21-15088
05/26/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Corrected Order Reinstating Briefing. This court previously suspended the briefing of this appeal and remanded this matter to the district court for the limited purpose of securing new appellate counsel for appellant. The district court has appointed attorney Michael Miceli of Pitaro & Fumo, Chtd. as counsel for appellant. The clerk of this court shall add Mr. Miceli and the law firm of Pitaro & Fumo to the docket as counsel for appellant. This court reinstates the briefing schedule as follows. Appellant shall have 14 days from the date of this order to file and serve a fast track reply brief, if deemed necessary. This court's previous order reinstating briefing is vacated. (SC)21-15141
06/09/2021MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Withdrawal Appeal (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED 06/10/21). (SC)
06/10/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Of Rejection - No Notice Of Appearance (Emily K. Strand). (SC)21-16701
06/16/2021MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Withdraw Appeal. (SC)21-17309
06/18/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order/Voluntary Dismissal. Appellant consents to a voluntary dismissal of this appeal. Cause appearing, this court "ORDERS this appeal DISMISSED." Case Closed/No Remittitur Issued. SNP21 - RP/LS/AS (SC)21-17575