Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 80461-COA
Short Caption:ARMSTRONG VS. TREASURE ISLAND HOTEL/CASINOCourt:Court of Appeals
Related Case(s):80461
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A795161Classification:Civil Appeal - Administrative Agency - General
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

+ Due Items

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
02/16/2021Case Status UpdateTransferred from Supreme Court. (COA).
05/25/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." Court of Appeals- MG/JT/BB. (VACATED PER 8/26/21 ORDER). (COA)21-15001
06/09/2021MotionFiled Respondents' Motion to Reissue Order as a Published Opinion (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED 06/09/21). (COA)
06/09/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Rejection of Filed Document. Motion to Reissue Order as a Published Opinion. (COA)21-16611
06/12/2021Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Appellant's Petition for Rehearing. (COA)21-16925
06/12/2021Filing FeeFiling fee paid. E-Payment $150.00 from James P. Kemp. (COA)
06/15/2021MotionFiled Respondents' Motion to Extend Time File Their Motion to Reissue Order as a Published Opinion. (TRANSFERRED FROM THE SUPREME COURT)(COA)21-17194
06/15/2021MotionFiled Respondents' Motion to Reissue Order as a Published Opinion. (TRANSFERRED FROM THE SUPREME COURT) (STRICKEN PER 8/19/21 ORDER). (COA)
06/16/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Answer to Petition for Rehearing. Answer due: 14 days. Appellant shall have 7 days from the filing and service of the answer to file and serve any reply. (COA)21-17347
06/29/2021Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Respondents' Answer to Appellant's Petition for Rehearing. (COA)21-18706
07/05/2021Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Appellant's Reply to Answer to Petition for Rehearing. (SC)21-19174
08/19/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion for Extension of Time. Respondents have filed a motion for an extension of time to file a motion to publish this court's May 25, 2020, order. Respondents' motion for an extension of time to file a motion to publish is denied. The clerk of the court shall strike the June 15, 2021, motion to publish that was filed in connection with the motion for an extension of time. (COA)21-24183
08/26/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order Vacating Prior Order, Vacating District Court Order and Remanding. "We vacate our prior Order of Affirmance, vacate the district court's order denying the petition for judicial review, and remand this matter to the district court to remand to the appeals officer to apply the recently enacted legislation." Court of Appeals- MG/JT/BB. (COA)21-24880