Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 82493
Short Caption:FUGATE (MATTHEW) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):69925, 82494
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR150134Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
02/18/2021Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee Waived. Criminal. (SC)
02/18/2021Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement and Notice of Briefing Schedule mailed to counsel for appellant.) (SC)21-04813
02/18/2021MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Consolidate Appeals. (Nos. 82493/82494). (SC)21-04878
02/23/2021Transcript RequestFiled Notice of No Transcript Request. (SC)21-05353
02/24/2021Docketing StatementFiled Appellant's Docketing Statement Criminal Appeals. (SC)21-05441
03/08/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order to Show Cause and Suspending Briefing. Appellant shall have 21 days from the date of this order within which to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. Respondent may file any reply within 14 days from the date that appellant's response is served. Briefing is suspended. fn1 [This court defers ruling on appellant's motions to consolidate these appeals, pending resolution of the perceived jurisdictional issues.] Nos. 82493/82494. (SC)21-06662
03/26/2021MotionFiled Appellant's Answer to Order to Show Cause & Appellant's Motion to Voluntarily Dismiss the Appeals in Dockets 82493 & 82494. (SC)21-08680
03/30/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellant has moved for a voluntary dismissal of these appeals. Because the instant motion is not accompanied by an affidavit, this court defers ruling on the motion. Counsel for appellant shall have 14 days from the date of this order within which to supplement the motion to dismiss these appeals with an affidavit of appellant or counsel. Nos. 82493/82494. (SC)21-09099
04/02/2021MotionFiled Affidavit in Support of Answer to Order to Show Cause & Motion to Voluntarily Dismiss the Appeals in Dockets 82493 & 82494. (SC)21-09603
04/02/2021MotionFiled Affidavit in Support of Answer to Order to Show Cause & Motion to Voluntarily Dismiss the Appeals in Dockets 82493 & 82494. (SC)21-09607
04/08/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDERS these appeals DISMISSED." fn1p[The motion to consolidate is denied as moot.] SNP21-RP/LS/AS Nos. 82493/82494. (SC)21-10145
05/03/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)21-12563
05/03/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
05/18/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on May 5, 2021. (SC)21-12563