Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 82497
Short Caption:MITCHELL VS. WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOC'Y, FSBCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A823462Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:Exempt
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
02/19/2021Filing FeeFiling Fee due for Appeal. (SC)
02/19/2021Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)21-04941
02/19/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC)21-04944
02/23/2021Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Law Office of Stephen M. Dixon. Check no. 1466. (SC)
02/23/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 21 days. (SC)21-05316
02/24/2021Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Exemption from Settlement Program. It has been determined that this appeal will not be assigned to the settlement program. Appellant: 14 days transcript request form; 120 days opening brief. (SC)21-05392
02/24/2021Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 11/10/20, 1/19/21, 2/9/21. To Court Reporter: Christine Erickson. (SC)21-05436
03/01/2021Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (SC)21-05904
04/23/2021MotionFiled Stipulation to Dismiss Appeal Pursuant to Settlement. (SC)21-11807
04/27/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order/Stipulated Dismissal. Order Dismissing Appeal. Pursuant to the stipulation of the parties, and cause appearing, "this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. Case Closed/No Remittitur Issued. (SC)21-12050