Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 82511
Short Caption:T4 CONSTR. LLC VS. TUMMARELLOCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A813054Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:03/03/2021 / Turner, WilliamSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
02/22/2021Filing FeeFiling Fee due for Appeal. (SC)
02/22/2021Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)21-05220
02/22/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC)21-05222
03/01/2021Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from T4 Construction. Check no. 3293. (SC)
03/01/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 21 days. (SC)21-05944
03/03/2021Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: William C. Turner. (SC)21-06294
03/22/2021Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (SC)21-08217
03/28/2021Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference will be scheduled as soon as counsel can agree to a date. (SC)21-08814
04/30/2021Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/No Settlement. After continuing discussions and mediation, the parties were unable to settle. (SC)21-12481
05/04/2021Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant(s): 14 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief and appendix. (SC)21-12779
07/12/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order to Show Cause. Appellant's Response due: 30 days. Respondents may file any reply within 14 days of service of appellant's response. The deadlines for filing documents are suspended pending further order of this court. (SC)21-19949
07/19/2021MotionFiled Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. (SC)21-20731
07/30/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order/Stipulated Dismissal. In response to this court's order to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction, appellant filed a stipulation to dismiss the appeal. The stipulation is approved, and "this appeal is dismissed." Case Closed/No Remittitur Issued. (SC)21-22166