Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 82512
Short Caption:EDWARDS (JULIE) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Nye Co. - Fifth Judicial District - CR9085Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
02/23/2021Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee Waived. Criminal. (SC)
02/23/2021Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement and Notice of Briefing Schedule mailed to counsel for appellant.) (SC)21-05267
02/23/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement/Criminal. Due date: 10 days. (SC)21-05271
03/05/2021Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Appellant's Case Appeal Statement. (SC)21-06474
03/15/2021Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellant's Docketing Statement due: March 30, 2021. (SC)21-07373
03/25/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Request Transcripts. Due date: 10 days. (SC)21-08629
03/30/2021Docketing StatementFiled Appellant's Criminal Docketing Statement. (SC)21-09189
03/30/2021Transcript RequestFiled Appellant's Certificate of No Transcript Request. (SC)21-09203
06/21/2021Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant's opening brief and appendix due: July 7, 2021. (SC)21-17743
06/28/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Appellant's Notice of Withdrawal of Appeal. (SC)21-18554
07/01/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order/Voluntary Dismissal. Appellant consents to a voluntary dismissal of this appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." Case Closed/No Remittitur Issued. NNP21-EC/KP/DH (SC)21-18989
07/14/2021OtherReturned Proper Person Unfiled Document. (SC)21-20222