Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 82515
Short Caption:IN RE: GUARDIANSHIP OF SHELDONCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Nye Co. - Fifth Judicial District - CV37459Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:03/03/2021 / Worrell, CarolynSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
02/23/2021Filing FeeFiling Fee due for Appeal. (SC)
02/23/2021Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)21-05284
02/23/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC)21-05286
03/02/2021Filing FeeE-Payment $250.00 from Katie A. Bindrup. (SC)
03/03/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 21 days. (SC)21-06206
03/03/2021Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Carolyn Worrell. (SC)21-06234
03/06/2021Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (SC)21-06584
05/19/2021Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Not Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is not appropriate for mediation. (SC)21-14443
05/20/2021Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order Removing From Settlement Program/Briefing Reinstated. This appeal is removed from the settlement program. Appellant(s): 14 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief. (SC)21-14530
06/02/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order to Show Cause. Appellant's Response due: 30 days. Respondent may file any reply within 14 days from the date that appellant's response is served. The deadlines for filing documents in this appeal shall be suspended pending further order of this court. (SC)21-15693
06/02/2021Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 01/20/21. To Court Reporter: None listed (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED 06/03/21). (SC)
06/03/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Deficient Transcript Request. (SC)21-15724
06/27/2021MotionFiled Appellant's Response to Order to Show Cause. (SC)21-18442
06/28/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Provide Proof of Service. Due date: 10 days. Appellant's Response to Order to Show Cause. (SC)21-18455
06/29/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Certificate of Mailing (Appellant's Response to Order to Show Cause). (SC)21-18745
07/13/2021Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 01/20/21. To Court Reporter: None listed. (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED 07/14/21). (SC)
07/14/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Rejection of Filed Document. Request for Transcript of Proceedings. (SC)21-20242
07/16/2021MotionFiled Respondent's Motion to Extend Time to File a Reply to Order to Show Cause. (SC)21-20581
07/16/2021MotionFiled Respondent's Reply to Response to Order to Show Cause. (SC)21-20582
07/30/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "This appeal is dismissed." fn1 [Respondent's motion for an extension of time to file a reply to appellant's response to the order to show cause is granted. Respondent's reply was filed on July 16, 2021.] SNP21 - RP/LS/AS (SC)21-22153
08/24/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)21-24689
08/24/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
09/07/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on August 27, 2021. (SC)21-24689