Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Combined Case Information: 80130-COA & 80130
Short Caption:CLARKE (ANTHONY) VS. STATECourt:Court of Appeals & Supreme Court
Related Case(s):80130, 80185
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR191352Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/03/2019Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee waived. Criminal. (SC)
12/03/2019Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)19-48936
12/09/2019Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. (Second NOA) (SC)19-49737
12/30/2019Letter/IncomingFiled Proper Person Appellant's Letter Regarding Case. (SC)19-52401
01/02/2020MotionFiled Proper Person Appellant's Motion for Appointment of Counsel. (SC)20-00150
01/03/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order of Limited Remand for Designation of Counsel. District Court's Order Appointing Counsel due: 35 days. fn1 [Given this order, this court takes no action in regard to appellant's requests for the appointment of counsel filed on December 30, 2019, and January 2, 2020.] (SC).20-00363
01/07/2020Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order Regarding Appointment of Counsel. The matter of appointment of counsel is hereby referred to the Appointed Counsel Administrator, Krista M. Meier, Esq. (SC)20-00818
01/27/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Documents from District Court Clerk - Carolyn "Lina" Tanner, Esq., appointed to represent appellant in this matter. (SC)20-03614
01/30/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Setting Briefing Scheduling. Appellant's Transcript Request Form and Docketing Statement due: 21 days; Opening Brief and Appendix due: 120 days. (SC).20-04219
02/10/2020Docketing StatementFiled Appellant's Docketing Statement. (SC)20-05579
02/11/2020Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 8/14/19, 8/21/19, 10/7/19, 10/14/19, 10/23/19, and 11/25/19. To Court Reporter: Isolde Zihn, Stephanie Koetting, T. Amundson, and Erin Ferretto. (SC)20-05685
02/19/2020TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter Isolde Zihn stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 8/14/19. (SC)20-06809
03/25/2020Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Court Reporter Erin Ferretto's Certificate of Delivery of Transcripts due: April 9, 2020. (SC).20-11414
03/31/2020TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Christina Amundson stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 10/14/19. (SC)20-12246
05/06/2020TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Erin Ferretto stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 11/7/19, 11/23/19, and 11/25/19. (SC)20-17123
05/28/2020Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: June 12, 2020. (SC).20-20207
06/12/2020MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time (REPLACED BY AMENDED MOTION). (SC)
06/12/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Amended Motion to Extend Time. (SC)20-21978
06/29/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: July 10, 2020. (SC).20-24015
07/08/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Opening Brief. (SC)20-25202
07/27/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: August 17, 2020. (SC)20-27233
08/05/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance of Counsel. It is hereby recommended that Tracie K. Lindeman, Esq. be appointed to represent appellant in this direct appeal. Filed in district court on 7/26/20. (SC)20-28914
08/15/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Opening Brief. (SC)20-30207
09/01/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Regarding Motion, Regarding Counsel, and Suspending Briefing. Attorney Tracie Lindeman has filed a document indicating that she has been recommended as appointed counsel, but an order has not yet been entered. Given these circumstances, the deadlines for filing documents are suspended until further order of this court. The district court shall have 28 days from the date of this order to enter an order appointing counsel for appellant. Within 7 days from the date of appointment, the district court clerk shall transmit to the clerk of this court a copy of the district court's written or minute order appointing appellate counsel. (SC)20-32123
09/08/2020Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order Appointing Counsel. Filed certified copy of order filed in district court on appointing Tracie Lindeman, Esq. as counsel for appellant. (SC)20-33000
09/14/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Reinstating Briefing. The clerk of this court shall add attorney Tracie Lindeman as counsel for appellant. Appellant shall have 60 days from the date of this order to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. fn1[If counsel intends to request additional transcripts, she shall file a supplemental transcript request form within 14 days from the date of this order.] (SC)20-33751
11/13/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC).20-41622
11/13/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Presentence Investigation Report. (SC)20-41623
11/13/2020AppendixFiled Joint Appendix. (SC).20-41624
11/30/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion to Transmit Presentence Investigation Report. Due: 14 days. (SC)20-43260
12/10/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Documents from District Court Clerk, Presentence Investigation Report. CR19-1352. (SEALED) (SC)
12/28/2020BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC)20-46656
01/27/2021BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC)21-02573
03/01/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Transfer Case to Court of Appeals. (SC).21-05945
03/01/2021Case Status UpdateTransferred to Court of Appeals. (SC).
03/01/2021Case Status UpdateTransferred from Supreme Court. (COA).
04/28/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." Court of Appeals-MG/JT/BB (COA)21-12165
04/28/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." Court of Appeals-MG/JT/BB (SC)
05/12/2021OtherReturned Unfiled Proper Person Document. (SC)21-13588
05/26/2021Case Status UpdateTransferred to Supreme Court. (COA).
05/26/2021Case Status UpdateTransferred from Court of Appeals. (SC).
05/26/2021Case Status UpdateCase Closed. (COA).
05/26/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC).21-15058
05/26/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC).
06/18/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on June 4, 2021. (SC)21-15058