Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 81546-COA
Short Caption:CHURCH, JR. (AVERY) VS. STATECourt:Court of Appeals
Related Case(s):48741, 56402, 59572, 68614, 68614-COA, 72408, 72408-COA, 81546
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C221905Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Other/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
03/01/2021Case Status UpdateTransferred from Supreme Court. (COA).
03/25/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Response. Respondent shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file and serve a response that specifically addresses this claim. (COA)21-08580
04/22/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Respondent's Notice of Appearance for John Niman. (COA)21-11635
04/22/2021BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief. (COA)21-11636
04/22/2021AppendixFiled Respondent's Appendix to Answering Brief. Vol. 1 (COA)21-11637
04/28/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." Court of Appeals-MG/JT/BB (COA)21-12208
05/05/2021BriefFiled Proper Person Reply Brief. (COA)21-12912
05/26/2021Case Status UpdateTransferred to Supreme Court. (COA).
05/26/2021Case Status UpdateCase Closed. (COA).