Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 82570
Short Caption:SAGA VS. HAKOPYANCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A787785Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:03/16/2021 / Haberfeld, StephenSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
03/03/2021Filing FeeFiling Fee due for Appeal. (SC)
03/03/2021Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)21-06247
03/03/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement/Civil. Due date: 10 days. (SC)21-06249
03/03/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC)21-06251
03/12/2021Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Appellants' Case Appeal Statement. (SC)21-07326
03/15/2021Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Neon Law Group. Check no. 3027. (SC)
03/15/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellants - due: 21 days. (SC)21-07427
03/16/2021Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Stephen E. Haberfeld. (SC)21-07548
03/19/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Appellants' (Trident Holdings, LLC) Notice of Bankruptcy Proceedings. (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED ON 3/19/21) (SC)21-07983
03/19/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED ON 3/19/21) (SC)21-07987
03/19/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Of Rejection - No Notice Of Appearance. (SC)21-07990
03/29/2021Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED 3/29/21). (SC)
03/29/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Rejection of Deficient Docketing Statement. Corrected docketing statement due: 5 days. (SC)21-08991
03/29/2021Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. (SC) (REJECTED PER 04/01/21 NOTICE).
04/01/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Appellants' Notice of Bankruptcy Proceedings. (SC)21-09449
04/01/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Rejection of Filed Document (Docketing Statement). (SC).21-09477
04/02/2021Docketing StatementFiled Appellants' Civil Docketing Statement. (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED ON 4/2/21) (SC)
04/02/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Deficient Docketing Statement. Corrected docketing statement due: 5 days. (SC)21-09636
04/02/2021Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. (SC).21-09675
04/07/2021Docketing StatementFiled Appellant's Civil Docketing Statement. (SC)21-10065
04/08/2021Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order Partially Dismissing Appeal Reinstating Briefing. We dismiss this appeal as to Trident Holdings, LLC, only. The clerk shall modify the caption accordingly. The remaining appellants shall have 14 days from the date of this order to file and serve a transcript request form. Appellants shall have 90 days from the date of this order to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. (SC)21-10102
04/22/2021Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 12/15/20 and 1/21/21. To Court Reporter: Peggy Isom and Pauline May. (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED ON 4/22/21).(SC)
04/22/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Deficient Transcript Request. (SC)21-11649
04/27/2021Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 01/21/21. To Court Reporter: Peggy Isom. (SC)21-12018
04/27/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order to Show Cause. Appellants' Response due: 30 days. Respondent may file any reply within 14 days from the date that appellants' response is served. The deadlines for filing documents in this appeal shall be suspended pending further order of this court. (SC)21-12096
05/28/2021TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: Court Reporter: Transcript. (REJECTED PER NOTICE FILED ON 5/28/21)(SC)
05/28/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Rejection of Filed Document. (SC)21-15348
07/14/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." NNP21 - EC/KP/DH (SC)21-20290
08/09/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)21-23021
08/09/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
08/20/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on August 9, 2021. (SC)21-23021