Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 82558-COA
Short Caption:WILLIAMS VS. DIST. CT. (ROBINSON)Court:Court of Appeals
Related Case(s):82558
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D599643Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus/Prohibition
Disqualifications:Case Status:Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
03/04/2021Case Status UpdateTransferred from Supreme Court. (COA).
03/04/2021Petition/WritFiled Emergency Petition for Writ of Mandamus And/Or Prohibition Staying District Court Order Requiring A Continuance of Joint Physical Custody, Requires Immediate Attention. (TRANSFERRED FROM THE SUPREME COURT PER 03/04/21 NOTICE). (COA).21-06343
03/04/2021AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ. (TRANSFERRED FROM THE SUPREME COURT PER 03/04/21 NOTICE). (COA).21-06344
03/08/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Written Order and Answer. Petitioner Jamaal Williams shall have 14 days from the date of this order to obtain from the district court a written order memorializing its oral ruling(s) and file and serve a supplemental appendix containing a copy of that written order. Robinson, on behalf of respondents, shall have 21 days from the date of this order to file and serve an answer, including authorities, against issuance of the requested writ. Williams shall have 7 days from the date when the answer is served to file and serve any reply. We take no action on the request for a stay pending our consideration of this petition; any such future request must be made by proper motion under NRAP 27. (COA)21-06589
03/12/2021AppendixFiled Petitioner's Supplemental Appendix Vol. 1. (COA)21-07286
03/29/2021Petition/WritFiled Real Party In Interest's Answer To Petition For Writ Of Mandamus And/Or Prohibition. (COA)21-09013
04/05/2021Petition/WritFiled Petitioner's Reply to Real Party in Interest's Answer to Petition for Writ of Mandamus and/or Prohibition. (COA)21-09813
04/06/2021Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. (COA)
04/13/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order Denying Petition for Writ of Mandamus or Prohibition. "ORDER the petition DENIED." Court of Appeals- MG/JT/BB. (COA)21-10661
05/10/2021Case Status UpdateTransferred to Supreme Court. (COA)
05/10/2021Case Status UpdateCase Closed. (COA)